This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 07:28:07 (UTC).

Alessandro Pirozzi et al v. Fiserv Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Alessandro Pirozzi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fiserv Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02130

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alessandro Pirozzi

Pirozzi Enterprises, LLC

Chef Alessandro Pirozzi, Inc.

Defendants

Fiserv Corporation

Card Connect

DOES 1 through 25,

Does 1 through 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Majid Foroozandeh Shahraki

Attorney at Foroozandeh Law Offices

23461 South Point Drive Suite 385

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Defendant Attorney

John W Peterson

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

2049 Century Park East Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #9 Defendants' MOTION to Transfer Action to the Eastern District of New York. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

13 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - J. Bintner Declaration

13 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of C. Green

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Declaration DECLARATION OF MAJID FOROOOZANDEH IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION T

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 31, 2022. (rrp) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Transfer #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

9 #3

Exhibit B

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Refund of Fees G-124. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#7

(#7) Application for Refund of Fees filed by Defendants Card Connect, Fiserv Corporation (Peterson, John) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit Ex 2 - Declaration of Maravent

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#15) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Eastern District of New York, 2:22-cv-00902 filed 2/18/2022. (iv) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #9 Defendants' MOTION to Transfer Action to the Eastern District of New York. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Transfer #9 filed by Defendants Card Connect, Fiserv Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of C. Green, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - J. Bintner Declaration)(Peterson, John) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Transfer #9 1 filed by Plaintiffs Chef Alessandro Pirozzi, Inc., Alessandro Pirozzi, Pirozzi Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MAJID FOROOOZANDEH IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, TRANSFER; EXHIBITS)(Shahraki, Majid) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 31, 2022. (rrp) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Transfer #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Transfer filed by Defendants Card Connect, Fiserv Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Peterson, John) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Refund of Fees G-124. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Refund of Fees filed by Defendants Card Connect, Fiserv Corporation (Peterson, John) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Card Connect, Does 1 through 25, Fiserv Corporation., filed by Plaintiffs Alessandro Pirozzi, Chef Alessandro Pirozzi, Inc., Pirozzi Enterprises, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/22/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Card Connect, Fiserv Corporation. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Card Connect, Fiserv Corporation. (Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01232995-CU-FR-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32547511 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Fiserv Corporation, Card Connect. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Summons and Service, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Declaration of Maravent) (Attorney John W Peterson added to party Card Connect(pty:dft), Attorney John W Peterson added to party Fiserv Corporation(pty:dft))(Peterson, John) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiserv, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Majid Foroozandeh Shahraki