This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 10:50:12 (UTC).

Polites v. Alchemy Finance, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Polites filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Alchemy Finance, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03862

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jared Polites

Defendants

AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited

One World Trade Center, 285 Fulton Street, Suite 8500

New York, NY 10007

Chen-Hsing Fan

Alchemy Company, Limited

One World Trade Center, 285 Fulton Street, Suite 8500

New York, NY 10007

Alchemy Finance, Inc.

Sheng-Weng Cheng

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Theodore Christian Sieving

Attorney at XNOVO LEGAL, P.C.

235 E. Broadway, Ste 800

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorney

Ross Evan Pitcoff

Attorney at The Law Offices of Ross Pitcoff

888C 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALCHEMY FINANCE, INC.; ALCHEMY COMPANY, LIMITED; ALCHEMYCOIN TECHNOLOGY LIMITED; SHENG-WENG CHENG; CHEN-HSING FAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jared Polites. (Sieving, Theodore) Modified on 5/1/2019 (pne). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit Token Swap Press Releases

21 #1

Memorandum of Law

1 #1

Exhibit Advisory Agreement

#2

>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 FIRST MOTION for Theodore Christian Sieving to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jared Polites. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16795116. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 1) missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; and 2) Attorney Affidavit is missing some of the language required by Local Rule 1.3, i.e. whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss on June 19, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/13/2019) (rro) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

21 #3

Exhibit Advisory Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Alchemy Company, Limited Registration

21 #6

Exhibit Alchemy Company Incorporation Address

#20

(#20) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint., FIRST MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .( Responses due by 7/17/2019) Document filed by Alchemy Company, Limited, Alchemy Finance, Inc., AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited, Sheng-Weng Cheng, Does 1-20, Chen-Hsing Fan.(Pitcoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

21 #5

Exhibit AlchemyCoin Business Registration

21 #4

Exhibit FINRA Search Results

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application

#21

(#21) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Alchemy Company, Limited, Alchemy Finance, Inc., AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited, Sheng-Weng Cheng, Does 1-20, Chen-Hsing Fan. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affirmation in Support, #3 Exhibit Advisory Agreement, #4 Exhibit FINRA Search Results, #5 Exhibit AlchemyCoin Business Registration, #6 Exhibit Alchemy Company Incorporation Address)(Pitcoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

21 #2

Affirmation in Support

1 #4

Exhibit AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited Registration

1 #2

Exhibit Proof of Transfer

2 #2

Affidavit Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Alchemy Company, Limited, Alchemy Finance, Inc., AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited, Sheng-Weng Cheng, Does 1-20, Chen-Hsing Fan. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affirmation in Support, #3 Exhibit Advisory Agreement, #4 Exhibit FINRA Search Results, #5 Exhibit AlchemyCoin Business Registration, #6 Exhibit Alchemy Company Incorporation Address)(Pitcoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) FIRST MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint., FIRST MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .( Responses due by 7/17/2019) Document filed by Alchemy Company, Limited, Alchemy Finance, Inc., AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited, Sheng-Weng Cheng, Does 1-20, Chen-Hsing Fan.(Pitcoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • (#19) ORDER. As discussed during the telephone conference held on June 19, 2019, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to dismiss: Defendants' motion is due no later than June 25, 2019; Plaintiff's opposition is due no later than three weeks following service of Defendants' motion; Defendants' reply is due no later than one week following service of Plaintiff's opposition. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on June 21, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2019. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (Daniels, Anthony) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/21/2019. Responses due by 7/12/2019 Replies due by 7/26/2019. (rro) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Conference. Application granted. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss on June 19, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/13/2019) (rro) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion letter in support of motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ross Pitcoff dated 6/12/2019. Document filed by Alchemy Company, Limited, Alchemy Finance, Inc., AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited, Sheng-Weng Cheng, Does 1-20, Chen-Hsing Fan.(Pitcoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted in part and denied in part. The initial pre-trial conference currently scheduled for June 3, 2019 is adjourned to July 29, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. The parties are directed to file the joint letter and Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order described in the Court's May 2, 2019 order no later than July 22, 2019. Defendants' request that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed for failure to effectuate service is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff filed his complaint on April 30, 2019. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) generally provides for service within 90 days of the filing of a complaint, as described in more detail in the rule. That 90 day period has not yet expired. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/21/2019) (mro) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Theodore Christian Sieving dated 05/20/2019 re: #14 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ross E. Pitcoff dated May 17th, 2019. . Document filed by Jared Polites. (Sieving, Theodore) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ross E. Pitcoff dated May 17th, 2019. Document filed by Alchemy Company, Limited, Alchemy Finance, Inc., AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited, Sheng-Weng Cheng, Does 1-20, Chen-Hsing Fan.(Pitcoff, Ross) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #5 SECOND MOTION for Theodore Christian Sieving to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jared Polites. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SECOND MOTION for Theodore Christian Sieving to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jared Polites. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jared Polites. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing CA Bar)(Sieving, Theodore) Modified on 5/1/2019 (wb). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALCHEMY FINANCE, INC.; ALCHEMY COMPANY, LIMITED; ALCHEMYCOIN TECHNOLOGY LIMITED; SHENG-WENG CHENG; CHEN-HSING FAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jared Polites. (Sieving, Theodore) Modified on 5/1/2019 (pne). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 FIRST MOTION for Theodore Christian Sieving to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jared Polites. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16795116. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 1) missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; and 2) Attorney Affidavit is missing some of the language required by Local Rule 1.3, i.e. whether the applicant has ever been convicted of a felony. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sieving, Theodore) Modified on 5/1/2019 (pne). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Theodore Christian Sieving to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jared Polites. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16795116. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jared Polites. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Affidavit Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Sieving, Theodore) Modified on 4/30/2019 (jc). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16794890)Document filed by Jared Polites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advisory Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proof of Transfer, #3 Exhibit Alchemy Company, Limited Registration, #4 Exhibit AlchemyCoin Technology, Limited Registration, #5 Exhibit Token Swap Press Releases)(Sieving, Theodore) Modified on 5/1/2019 (pne). (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.