This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2020 at 09:05:31 (UTC).

IHOP Restaurants LLC v. Elston et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 IHOP Restaurants LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Elston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Kernodle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IHOP Restaurants LLC

Defendants

Meredith Elston

1385 - Tyler, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Clark Bookhout

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US) - Dallas

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Noah M. Schottenstein

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US) - Dallas

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert Myers Hoffman

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US) - Dallas

1900 North Pearl Street, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IHOP Restaurants LLC. 1385 - Tyler, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IHOP Restaurants LLC. Meredith Elston served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IHOP Restaurants LLC identifying Corporate Parent DineBrands Global for IHOP Restaurants LLC. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Noah M. Schottenstein on behalf of IHOP Restaurants LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7686623. (Schottenstein, Noah) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Myers Hoffman on behalf of IHOP Restaurants LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7684879. (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

2 #1

Summons(es)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to 1385 - Tyler, Inc. and Meredith Elston and emailed to plaintiff to serve. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ndc) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7681220.), filed by IHOP Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Bookhout, James) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IHOP Restaurants LLC. 1385 - Tyler, Inc. served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by IHOP Restaurants LLC. Meredith Elston served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IHOP Restaurants LLC identifying Corporate Parent DineBrands Global for IHOP Restaurants LLC. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Noah M. Schottenstein on behalf of IHOP Restaurants LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7686623. (Schottenstein, Noah) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Myers Hoffman on behalf of IHOP Restaurants LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7684879. (Hoffman, Robert) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bookhout, James) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to 1385 - Tyler, Inc. and Meredith Elston and emailed to plaintiff to serve. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ndc) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7681220.), filed by IHOP Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Bookhout, James) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IHOP Restaurants, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M Hoffman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah M. Schottenstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James C. Bookhout