This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:34:21 (UTC).

Poer v. City of Commerce City, The et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 Poer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Commerce City, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis T. Babcock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01088

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sherry (I) Poer

Sherry Poer

Defendants

Travis Turner

Chris Dickey

City of Commerce City, The

Tim Norton

Travis (I) Turner

Chris (I) Dickey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Nathan Fisher

4600 South Syracuse Street, 9Th Floor

Denver, CO 80237

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan Cary Lubeck

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 900, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

Jonathan Marshall Abramson

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 900, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

Gillian Dale

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Mark Scott Ratner

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #3

Summons

11 #2

Summons

11 #1

Summons

#11

10 #4

Summons Turner Summons

10 #3

Summons Norton Summons

10 #2

Summons Dickey Summons

10 #1

Summons Commerce City Summons

#10

#9

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. City of Commerce City, The waiver sent on 5/13/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Fisher, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. Tim Norton waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Fisher, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. Travis (I) Turner waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Fisher, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. Chris Dickey waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Fisher, David) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Scott Ratner on behalf of Chris (I) Dickey, Tim Norton, Travis TurnerAttorney Mark Scott Ratner added to party Chris (I) Dickey(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Scott Ratner added to party Tim Norton(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Scott Ratner added to party Travis Turner(pty:dft) (Ratner, Mark) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gillian Dale on behalf of Chris (I) Dickey, Tim Norton, Travis (I) TurnerAttorney Gillian Dale added to party Chris (I) Dickey(pty:dft), Attorney Gillian Dale added to party Tim Norton(pty:dft), Attorney Gillian Dale added to party Travis (I) Turner(pty:dft) (Dale, Gillian) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Cary Lubeck on behalf of City of Commerce City, TheAttorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party City of Commerce City, The(pty:dft) (Lubeck, Jordan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Marshall Abramson on behalf of City of Commerce City, TheAttorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party City of Commerce City, The(pty:dft) (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 5/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (angar, ) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Commerce City, Dickey, Norton, Turner by Plaintiffs Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Commerce City Summons, #2 Summons Dickey Summons, #3 Summons Norton Summons, #4 Summons Turner Summons)(Fisher, David) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Norton, Turner, Dickey by Plaintiffs Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dickey Summons, #2 Summons Norton Summons, #3 Summons Turner Summons)(Fisher, David) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Dickey, Norton, Turner by Plaintiffs Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dickey Summons, #2 Summons Norton Summons, #3 Summons Turner Summons)(Fisher, David) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #5 Amended Complaint filed by attorney David Nathan Fisher.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents ALSO, document #5 Amended Complaint filed by attorney David Nathan Fisher. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (angar, ) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sheriff Tim Norton by Plaintiffs Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fisher, David) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sherry Poer.(Fisher, David) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to City of Commerce City, Travis Turner, Chris Dickey by Plaintiffs Sherry Poer, Sherry (I) Poer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Fisher, David) (Entered: 05/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (rsams, ) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6632551)Attorney David Nathan Fisher added to party Sherry Poer(pty:est), filed by Sherry Poer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, David) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Cary Lubeck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Ratner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gillian Dale(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M. Abramson