This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:19:04 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Royce C. Lamberth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00917

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Royce C. Lamberth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRISTAN WALLACE

SILVIA BURLEY

CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE

RASHEL REZNOR

ANJELICA PAULK

Petitioners

GILBERT RAMIREZ, JR.,

MICHAEL MENDIBLES

ANTOINETTE LOPEZ

CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE TRIBAL COUNCIL

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DAVID L. BERNHARDT

TARA SWEENEY

BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS

Troy Burdick

Mervel Harris

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter D. Lepsch

Attorney at FREDERICKS PEEBLES & PATTERSON LLP

401 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20004

Petitioner Attorneys

James F. Rusk

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert J. Uram

Attorney at SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON, LLP

Four Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Christopher Michael Loveland

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 100

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Brian Matthew Collins

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ERRATA Re Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE. (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE re #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Errata by SILVIA BURLEY, CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE re #21 Notice (Other), (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by SILVIA BURLEY, , ANJELICA PAULK, GILBERT RAMIREZ, JR, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE (Lepsch, Peter) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct filers (jf). (Entered: 05/24/2019)

20 #3

Exhibit B

10 #5

Declaration to Opposition

10 #4

Exhibit Opposition

#10

(#19) Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by SILVIA BURLEY, CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PLAINTIFFS. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

1 #7

Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibits

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Summons - Burdick

1 #3

Summons Summons - Harris

1 #2

Summons Summons - Sweeney

1 #1

Summons Summons - Bernhardt

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID L. BERNHARDT, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, Troy Burdick, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, Mervel Harris, TARA SWEENEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6034371) filed by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, TRISTAN WALLACE, SILVIA BURLEY, RASHEL REZNOR. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Bernhardt, #2 Summons Summons - Sweeney, #3 Summons Summons - Harris, #4 Summons Summons - Burdick, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibits, #7 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Lepsch, Peter) (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/2/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ERRATA Re Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE. (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE re #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Errata by SILVIA BURLEY, CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE re #21 Notice (Other), (Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by SILVIA BURLEY, , ANJELICA PAULK, GILBERT RAMIREZ, JR, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE (Lepsch, Peter) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct filers (jf). (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE TRIBAL COUNCIL, ANTOINETTE LOPEZ, MICHAEL MENDIBLES, GILBERT RAMIREZ, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher Loveland, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Loveland, Christopher) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by SILVIA BURLEY, CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on April 12, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-63. Date of Issuance: April 15, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal o r purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2019.(wz) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO; denying #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/12/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/12/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DAVID L. BERNHARDT, TROY BURDICK, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, MERVEL HARRIS, TARA SWEENEY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Affidavit Declaration of Troy Burdick)(Collins, Brian) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to US Attorney General & US ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (jf) Modified on 4/9/2019 (jf). (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney for District of Columbia and Attorney General of the United States filed by TRISTAN WALLACE, SILVIA BURLEY, CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, RASHEL REZNOR.(Lepsch, Peter) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by DAVID L. BERNHARDT, TROY BURDICK, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, MERVEL HARRIS, TARA SWEENEY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Collins, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Matthew Collins on behalf of All Defendants (Collins, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID L. BERNHARDT, TROY BURDICK, MERVEL HARRIS, TARA SWEENEY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by SILVIA BURLEY, CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, RASHEL REZNOR, TRISTAN WALLACE (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lepsch, Peter). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 4/10/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PLAINTIFFS. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID L. BERNHARDT, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, Troy Burdick, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, Mervel Harris, TARA SWEENEY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6034371) filed by CALIFORNIA VALLEY MIWOK TRIBE, ANJELICA PAULK, TRISTAN WALLACE, SILVIA BURLEY, RASHEL REZNOR. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Bernhardt, #2 Summons Summons - Sweeney, #3 Summons Summons - Harris, #4 Summons Summons - Burdick, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit Exhibits, #7 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Lepsch, Peter) (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/2/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Valley Miwok Tribe is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James F Rusk