This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2023 at 07:05:50 (UTC).

Miller v. Department of Justice et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2023 Miller filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Department of Justice. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ezra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00269

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travis Miller

Defendants

Department of Justice

Department of State

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis Wilson Miller

Defendant Attorney

Landon Allen Wade

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOJ and DOS ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Landon Allen Wade added to party Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Landon Allen Wade added to party Department of State(pty:dft) by Department of Justice, Department of State.(Wade, Landon) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Docket(#6) TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before May 1, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Department of Justice, Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wade, Landon) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Miller. All Defendants. (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lt) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2023
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by travis wilson miller. (Miller, Travis) (Entered: 03/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (lt) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS (RP) AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17187055). No Summons requested at this time, filed by travis wilson miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Travis) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2023 to flatten form) (lt). Modified on 3/14/2023 (lt). (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less