This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 08:18:46 (UTC).

v. Curphey et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 v Curphey was filed as a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03433

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Dean Curphey

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendants

Wassell

Wilcox

Karasawa

Verrazane

Winters

Norton

Lindgren

USA

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Timothy Dean Curphey. (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. That the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to FLM-LegalSvcs-S@bop.gov. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 21-3433.(e-mailed as ordered)(evana, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Prisoner Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice for the reasons discussed above, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/28/2022. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Prisoner Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice for the reasons discussed above, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/28/2022. (angar, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is granted. That the Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to FLM-LegalSvcs-S@bop.gov. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 21-3433.(e-mailed as ordered)(evana, ) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Timothy Dean Curphey. (norlin, ) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER'S COMPLAINT against Karasawa, Lindgren, Norton, USA, Verrazane, Wassell, Wilcox, Winters, filed by Timothy Dean Curphey.(norlin, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2021: #1 Envelope) (norlin, ). (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINTERS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Wilcox is a litigant

Latest cases where SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINERTON BUILDERS INC. is a litigant