This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:58:39 (UTC).

S&D TRADING COMPANY v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 S D TRADING COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S&D Trading Company, Inc.

S&D TRADING COMPANY INC

Defendants

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

International Insurance Company of Hannover SE

London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Inurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's

United Specialty Insurance Company

SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS

LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO AMR-55022-02

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ERIC WILLIAM DICKEY

Attorney at MERLIN LAW GROUP - TAMPA FL

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 950

Tampa, FL 33602

KELLY L KUBIAK

Attorney at MERLIN LAW GROUP - TAMPA FL

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

ARTHUR GRADY WILLIAMS, IV

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP - MOBILE AL

101 Dauphin Street, Suite 1000

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER. Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED, and the action is hereby STAYED pending the conclusion of arbitration. Defendants must file a status report every 120 days informing the Court of the progress of those proceedings and notify the Court within 14 days of a final resolution. ( Status Report due by 8/13/2019.) Set/Clear Flags. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/15/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

7 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Record

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#7

(#7) MOTION to Stay by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Inurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record) (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2019. Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/3/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - arbitration demand

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - policy

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Inurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - arbitration demand) (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Inurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company. Amendment to #2 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Consent to Removal (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE re #2 Notice of Removal,, (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02 from Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit, case number 19000650CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4446385.), filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER. Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED, and the action is hereby STAYED pending the conclusion of arbitration. Defendants must file a status report every 120 days informing the Court of the progress of those proceedings and notify the Court within 14 days of a final resolution. ( Status Report due by 8/13/2019.) Set/Clear Flags. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/15/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. (alb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Stay by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Inurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record) (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/17/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2019. Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/3/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Inurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - arbitration demand) (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Inurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company. Amendment to #2 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Consent to Removal (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02, International Insurance Company of Hannover SE re #2 Notice of Removal,, (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02 from Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit, case number 19000650CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4446385.), filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate No. AMR-55022-02. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WILLIAMS, ARTHUR) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less