This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2021 at 12:24:01 (UTC).

Cathexis Royalties & Minerals, LP et al v. Sanchez Energy Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Cathexis Royalties Minerals, LP filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sanchez Energy Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MC-00069

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Cathexis Royalties & Minerals, LP

DJH Minerals, LP

Petitioner

Murphy Exploration & Production Company

Defendants and In Re

Cathexis Royalties & Minerals, LP (In re: DJH Minerals, LP, et al.)

Sanchez Energy Corporation

SN Catarina, LLC

SN Operating, LLC

In Re and Defendants

SN UR Holdings, LLC

SN TMS, LLC

SN Cotulla Assets, LLC

Mesquite Energy, Inc.

SN EF Maverick, LLC

Sanchez Energy Corporation

SN Catarina, LLC

SN Payables, LLC

SN Operating, LLC

SN Palmetto,LLC

Rockin L Ranch Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

William Dimitrious Wood

Attorney at McKool Smith PC

600 Travis Street, Suite 7000

Houston, TX 77002

John J. Sparacino

Attorney at McKool Smith

600 Travis Street, Suite 7000

Houston, TX 77002

Lisa Ann Houssiere

Attorney at McKool Smith

600 Travis Street, Suite 7000

Houston, TX 77002

Paul Edward Williams

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

600 Travis St., Suite 7000

Houston, TX 77002

Hector Raul Chavez, III

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan and Veslka LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002-2761

Larry R. Veselka

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan & Veselka

717 Texas Avenue, Suie 2800

Houston, TX 77002-2761

Petitioner Attorneys

Jonathan D. Baughman

Attorney at McGinnis, Lochridge

609 Main Street, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher Lance Halgren

Attorney at McGinnis Lochridge LLP

609 Main Street, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

William K. Grubb

Attorney at McGinnis Lochridge LLP

609 Main St., Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Kabat

Attorney at McGinnis Lochridge LLP

600 Congress Ave., Suite 2100

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant and In Re Attorney

Daniel M. McClure

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

6 #6

Proposed Order

6 #5

Exhibit D

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhbit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

1 #8

Proposed Order

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #6 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Based on Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA's February 4, 2021 notice informing the Court that Cathexis Royalties & Minerals, LP has withdrawn the subpoena at issue in its entirety, (Dkt. 8), IT IS ORDERERED that Murphy's Motion to Quash, (Dkt. 6), is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Murphy Exploration & Production Company (Baughman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Support, filed by Murphy Exploration & Production Company, re #6 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Murphy Exploration & Production Company (Baughman, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Non-Party MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued by Cathexis by Murphy Exploration & Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhbit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(lt) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiff's Motion to Quash is limited to no more than 19 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE In Opposition to Murphy Exploration & Production Company-USA's Motion to Quash #6 by Cathexis Royalties & Minerals, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Wood, William) Modified on 2/1/2021 to create docket entry relationship (lt). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney William K. Grubb. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Lance Halgren on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company (Halgren, Christopher) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William K. Grubb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14413172) by on behalf of Murphy Exploration & Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grubb, William) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to William K. Grubb re: non-admitted status. (cj) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limits for its Motion to Quash ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14404643). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Murphy Exploration & Production Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(Baughman, Jonathan) Modified on 2/1/2021 (lt). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murphy Exploration & Production Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SN Operating, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John James Sparacino