This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 07:43:10 (UTC).

Combs v. Capital One Financial (TV3)

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Combs filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capital One Financial TV3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher H Steger and Thomas A Varlan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Kyle Combs

Signal Mountain, TN 37377

Defendant

capital one financial

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Samuel Aitken Morris

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP (Nashville)

222 Second Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT (KMK, ) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: a final pretrial conference will be held in Knoxville on Tuesday, May 26, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The trial of this case will be held in Knoxville before the undersigned without a jury beginning on Tuesday, June 2, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 15, 2019. (copy mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs, 1461 Palisades Road, Signal Mountain, TN 37377) (AYB) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Capital One Financial of Plaintiff's Non-Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss (Morris, Samuel) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (KMK, ). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (SAC, )Mailed to Combs. (Entered: 03/11/2019)

9 #1

Consent/Non-Consent

#9

(#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent) (SAC, )Order mailed to Combs. (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss . (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Capital One Financial. (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #2 Notice, #1 Notice of Removal. Informational only, for future reference when filing a corporate disclosurestatement please use the event Certificate of Corporate Interest. Also, whenfiling a civil cover sheet please file it in a non fillable format. (JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by capital one financial Corporate Disclosure Statement (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

1 #2

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County General Sessions, case number 19GS151. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3906970), filed by capital one financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT (KMK, ) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: a final pretrial conference will be held in Knoxville on Tuesday, May 26, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. The trial of this case will be held in Knoxville before the undersigned without a jury beginning on Tuesday, June 2, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on April 15, 2019. (copy mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs, 1461 Palisades Road, Signal Mountain, TN 37377) (AYB) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Capital One Financial of Plaintiff's Non-Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss (Morris, Samuel) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (KMK, ). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (SAC, )Mailed to Combs. (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent) (SAC, )Order mailed to Combs. (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss . (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Capital One Financial. (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/4/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Christopher Kyle Combs)(JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #2 Notice, #1 Notice of Removal. Informational only, for future reference when filing a corporate disclosurestatement please use the event Certificate of Corporate Interest. Also, whenfiling a civil cover sheet please file it in a non fillable format. (JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by capital one financial Corporate Disclosure Statement (Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County General Sessions, case number 19GS151. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3906970), filed by capital one financial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.