This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:56:55 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc et al v. Carrie Bell, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Carrie Bell, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01517

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Mokojumbi Music

Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC

Hip City Music Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Hifrost Publishing

Porpete Music

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Universal Music MGB NA LLC

Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC doing business as Universal Music Z Songs

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony ATV Melody

Universal Music MGB NA LLC doing business as Universal Music Careers

Randall Jones

Renell Jones

Karen Jones

Randy Jones

Carrie Bell, Inc. d/b/a Cafe 611

Carrie Bell, Inc.

Carrie Bell, Inc. doing business as Cafe 611

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Max S Stadfeld

Attorney at Wright, Constable & Skeen, L.L.P.

7 Saint Paul Street, 18Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Text of Proposed Order

17 #1

Exhibit 1

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Summons

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Supplement

#5

#4

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Alternative Service Upon Defendants Karen Jones, Randall Jones and Randy Jones by Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Mokojumbi Music, Porpete Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hip City Music Inc., Porpete Music, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Mokojumbi Music, Hifrost Publishing as to Karen Jones, Randall Jones, Randy Jones.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER directing plaintiffs to file and serve within 30 days a motion for entry of default as to Defendant Carrie Bell, Inc., or to provide a report to the Court why such motion is inappropriate. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/16/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Renell Jones (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Renell Jones (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hip City Music Inc., Porpete Music, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Mokojumbi Music, Hifrost Publishing. Carrie Bell, Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Reissued as to Carrie Bell, Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc. to Reissue Summons for Defendant Carrie Bell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Hip City Music Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing as to Carrie Bell, Inc..(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as Defendant Renell Jones by Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER directing plaintiffs to file and serve within 30 days a motion for entry of default as to Defendant Renell Jones or provide a report to the Court why such motion is inappropriate. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/18/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hip City Music Inc., Porpete Music, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Mokojumbi Music, Hifrost Publishing. Renell Jones served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019.(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Mokojumbi Music, Porpete Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent Tegna, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Stadfeld, Max) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Carrie Bell, Inc., Karen Jones, Randall Jones, Randy Jones, Renell Jones.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Correspondence to Register of Copyrights re: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (c/m 5/23/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) [FILED IN ERROR - atty to refile] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Other Affiliate Hip City Music, Inc., Other Affiliate Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs, Other Affiliate Universal Music MGB NA, LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Other Affiliate Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony ATV Melody for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Stadfeld, Max) Modified on 5/23/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Carrie Bell, Inc. d/b/a Cafe 611, Karen Jones, Randall Jones, Randy Jones, Renell Jones ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8027943.), filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Carrie Bell, Inc. d/b/a Cafe 611, #4 Summons Karen Jones, #5 Summons Randall Jones, #6 Summons Randy Jones, #7 Summons Renell Jones)(Stover, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HIP CITY MUSIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-MGB NA, LLC is a litigant