This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:45:56 (UTC).

Maria Betancourt et al v JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Maria Betancourt filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00870

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Betancourt

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph C. LoTempio

Attorney at The Dellutri Law Group, PA

1436 Royal Palm Square Blvd

Ft Myers, FL 33919-1049

Defendant Attorneys

Alisa M. Taormina

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3100

Miami, FL 33131-5323

Brian C. Frontino

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3100

Miami, FL 33131-5323

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Maria Betancourt re #24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Maria Betancourt (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#22

(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#18) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice of Service (Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#4

(#8) NOTICE by Maria Betancourt re #4 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#18

(#18) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice of Service (Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#24

(#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #14 Answer by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#14

(#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #14 Answer by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#23

(#23) FAST TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/16/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Lee County, Florida, case number 19-CA-007357 filed in State Court on 11/04/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16225703 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria Betancourt. Related case(s): yes (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

#27

(#27) Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TEXT ORDER denying as moot #24 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time based upon the representations set for in Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal (Doc. #25). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/28/2020. (JTB) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Maria Betancourt re #24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Maria Betancourt (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses re #14 Answer by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) FAST TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/16/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file any motion to strike affirmative defenses no later than 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/6/2020. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing set on 2/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C. Please note that the CMR deadline is still set as 1/27/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice of Service (Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/12/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for Leave to Conduct the Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may conduct their Case Management Conference by telephone for the purpose of preparing the joint Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/10/2019. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Maria Betancourt re #4 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Taormina, Alisa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria Betancourt. Related case(s): yes (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Maria Betancourt. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Maria Betancourt.(RMT) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Taormina, Alisa) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-870-FtM-38MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Lee County, Florida, case number 19-CA-007357 filed in State Court on 11/04/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16225703 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frontino, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less