Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:31:02 (UTC).

Berens v. CSX Transporation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Berens filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against CSX Transporation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

Scott R. Berens

Defendants

CSX Transporation, Inc.

Scott R. Berens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth R. Reed

Attorney at Kenneth R. Reed, Attorney, PSC

241 Elm Street

Ludlow, KY 41016

James R Carnes

Attorney at Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, L.L.P.

1000 Jackson Street

Toledo, OH 43604-5573

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of H. David Leibensperger (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Perry Matthew Darby (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Perry Matthew Darby by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of H. David Leibensperger by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CSX Transporation, Inc., CSX Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transporation, Inc... (Carnes, James) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CSX Transporation, Inc.. (Carnes, James) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CSX Transporation, Inc. (sct) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CSX Transporation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6809329), filed by Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of H. David Leibensperger (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Perry Matthew Darby (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #5 and #6 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Motions were unsigned. Counsel to file signature pages using the event Notice(Other). (sct) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Perry Matthew Darby by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of H. David Leibensperger by Plaintiff Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants CSX Transporation, Inc., CSX Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transporation, Inc... (Carnes, James) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by CSX Transporation, Inc.. (Carnes, James) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to CSX Transporation, Inc. (sct) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • ***If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (sct) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against CSX Transporation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6809329), filed by Scott R. Berens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Reed, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSX TRANSPORATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth R. Reed