This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2022 at 09:03:27 (UTC).

Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates v. Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's, London et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's, London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and William Matthewman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-80254

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates

Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Seaview House 70 Seaview Ave

Stamford, CT 06902

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

777 S. Harbour Island Boulevard, Suite 500

Tampa, FL 33602

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Company

100 S Ashley Drive

Tampa, FL 33602

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

1501 S. Church Ave, 200

Tampa, FL 33629

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vyacheslav Borshchukov

4141 Nautilus Dr. #2B

Miami Beach, FL 33140

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Marie Fluet

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith

620 East Twiggs Street, Suite 303

Tampa, FL 33602

Anna Pearl Kirkpatrick

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr and Smith

400 N Ashley Drive, Suite 1000

Tampa, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) NOTICE by Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates of Mediator Selection (Borshchukov, Vyacheslav) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#22

(#22) Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's State Court Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Striking #19 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, Steadfast Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company (Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#23

(#23) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Mediator Selection. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#19

(#19) STRICKEN First REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's State Court Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Kirkpatrick, Anna) Modified on 3/29/2022 per DE #21 Notice (kpe). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

12 #3

Exhibit Correspondence

12 #2

Exhibit Policy

12 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

12 #12

Main Document

5 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Demand for Arbitration Ltr

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Policy

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Lack of Prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Notice (Other). Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator.Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. (drz) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE by Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates of Mediator Selection (Borshchukov, Vyacheslav) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's State Court Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Striking #19 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, Steadfast Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company (Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Clerks Notice to Filer re #19 Reply to Response to Motion,,. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (kpe) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Mediator Selection. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STRICKEN First REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Complaint Plaintiff's State Court Complaint filed by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Kirkpatrick, Anna) Modified on 3/29/2022 per DE #21 Notice (kpe). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates. Replies due by 3/28/2022. (Borshchukov, Vyacheslav) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 3/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Setting Trial Date & Discovery Deadlines : ( Trial set for 8/7/2023 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 8/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's MOTION for Courts Entry of Default pursuant to Federal Debt Collections Procedures Act (FDCPA) Title 28, U.S.C., Section 3205(6) as to All Defendants by Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates. (Borshchukov, Vyacheslav) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company - Motions Terminated: #6 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Responsive pleading ( Motion to Dismiss Complaint) has been filed. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/7/2022. (kpe) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants filed by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Replies due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Notice of Hearing)(Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 03/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Atlantic Avenue Realty Associates. (Borshchukov, Vyacheslav) (Entered: 03/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's State Court Complaint by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Demand for Arbitration Ltr)(Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for Lack of Prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2022. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15406914, filed by Certain Underwriters at LLoyds,London. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(Kirkpatrick, Anna) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant