This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:54:43 (UTC).

Beckett v. Aramark Facility Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Beckett filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Aramark Facility Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01018

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marquis Beckett

Defendant

Aramark Facility Services, LLC

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B Joeckel, Jr

Attorney at Joeckel Law Office

219 South Main Street, Suite 301

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Jonathan J Walters

Attorney at The Joeckel Law Office

219 South Main Street, Suite 301

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Defendant Attorneys

Ethel Jean Johnson

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Perkins Jaynes

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

William C Meier

Attorney at Law Office Senator Bill Meier, Ret.

2233 Farrington Ln

Hurst, TX 76054

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Courts four- week docket beginning December 7, 2020. The Court hereby REFERS this case to mediation and APPOINTS Senator William C. Meier, Associate Justice Second Texas Court of Appeals (retired) as the mediator in this case. The parties shall mediate with Senator Meier on or before June 15, 2020. Within seven days after the mediation, the parties shall jointly prepare and file a written report. (see order for further specifics) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2020) (edm) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/7/2020 before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 6/8/2020. Initial Expert Designation and Report July 6 2020; Discovery due by 7/13/2020. Motions due by 8/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2020) (wrb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Conference Report of the Parties filed by Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Jaynes, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Aramark Facility Services, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Johnson, Ethel) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Perkins Jaynes on behalf of Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jaynes, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER... Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/9/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aramark Facility Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Aramark Services Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Aramark Intermediate HoldCo Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Aramark for Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Johnson, Ethel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit(s) Ex. D to Index - Tarrant County Docket

1 #6

Exhibit(s) Ex. C to Index - Service of Process

1 #5

Exhibit(s) Ex. B to Index - Citation Issued

1 #4

Exhibit(s) Ex. A to Index - Plaintiff's Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit(s) Index to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 67th District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 067-312758-19 filed by Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Filer fee note- FW0539-10461392.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Index to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. A to Index - Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. B to Index - Citation Issued, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. C to Index - Service of Process, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex. D to Index - Tarrant County Docket) (Johnson, Ethel) Modified to add payment information on 12/9/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2020) (wxc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Courts four- week docket beginning December 7, 2020. The Court hereby REFERS this case to mediation and APPOINTS Senator William C. Meier, Associate Justice Second Texas Court of Appeals (retired) as the mediator in this case. The parties shall mediate with Senator Meier on or before June 15, 2020. Within seven days after the mediation, the parties shall jointly prepare and file a written report. (see order for further specifics) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2020) (edm) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/7/2020 before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 6/8/2020. Initial Expert Designation and Report July 6 2020; Discovery due by 7/13/2020. Motions due by 8/10/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2020) (wrb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Conference Report of the Parties filed by Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Jaynes, Christopher) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Aramark Facility Services, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Johnson, Ethel) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Perkins Jaynes on behalf of Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jaynes, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER... Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/9/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aramark Facility Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Aramark Services Inc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Aramark Intermediate HoldCo Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Aramark for Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Johnson, Ethel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 67th District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 067-312758-19 filed by Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (Filer fee note- FW0539-10461392.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Index to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. A to Index - Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. B to Index - Citation Issued, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. C to Index - Service of Process, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex. D to Index - Tarrant County Docket) (Johnson, Ethel) Modified to add payment information on 12/9/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less