This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 09:23:40 (UTC).

AES Shady Point LLC v. Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 AES Shady Point LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Oklahoma Gas Electric Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00910

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AES Shady Point LLC

AES Shady Point Inc, a Delaware limited liability company

Defendant

Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carson K Glass

Attorney at Hall Estill-TULSA

320 S Boston Ave, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Tami J Hines

Attorney at Hall Estill-OKC

100 N Broadway Ave, Suite 2900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

James M Reed

Attorney at Hall Estill-TULSA

320 S Boston Ave, Suite 400

Tulsa, OK 74103-3708

Defendant Attorneys

A Craig Tomlin

Attorney at Law Office of A Craig Tomlin

116 E Sheridan Ave, Suite 207

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Robin F Fields

Attorney at Conner & Winters-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Valerie V Hatami

Attorney at Conner & Winters-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jennifer H Castillo

Attorney at OGE Energy Corp

321 N Harvey, P O Box 321 M/C 1208

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Heidi M Nichols

Attorney at Conner & Winters-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit Exh 4 - Affidavit of Rick Jackson

#19

(#19) REPLY by Plaintiff AES Shady Point LLC re #11 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by AES Shady Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 4 - Affidavit of Rick Jackson)(Reed, James) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

18 #5

Exhibit 5 - Letter to K. Mitchell from M. Miller 8.17.18

18 #4

Exhibit 4 - AES Shady Point Amended Power Sales Agreement 12.10.85

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand with Brief in Support filed by Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AES Shady Point Petition 5.6.2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - AES Shady Point Asset Purchase Agreement 12.20.18, #3 Exhibit 3 - K. Mitchell Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 - AES Shady Point Amended Power Sales Agreement 12.10.85, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to K. Mitchell from M. Miller 8.17.18, #6 Exhibit 6 - Termination Notice 8.24.18, #7 Exhibit 7 - AES Check Request - Distribution Form 2.15.19, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email from Rick Jackson 4.18.19, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email from Carrie Scribner 4.29.19, #10 Exhibit 10 - AES Notice of Default Letter 5.1.20)(Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement between AES and OG&E (attached to Notice of Rem

11 #2

Exhibit Affidavit R. Jackson

11 #1

Exhibit Amended Power Sales Agreement Between Oklahoma Gas and Electric Company

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand by AES Shady Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Power Sales Agreement Between Oklahoma Gas and Electric Company and AES Shady Point Inc., #2 Exhibit Affidavit R. Jackson, #3 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement between AES and OG&E (attached to Notice of Removal))(Hines, Tami) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer H Castillo on behalf of Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation (Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6- LinkedIn Profile

1 #5

Exhibit 5- Gluski Biography

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Purchase Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Notice of Termination

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Docket

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Petition

#1

(#9) ORDER granting with modifications #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation answer due 9/30/2020.. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/28/2020. (dtb) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY by Plaintiff AES Shady Point LLC re #11 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by AES Shady Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 4 - Affidavit of Rick Jackson)(Reed, James) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand with Brief in Support filed by Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AES Shady Point Petition 5.6.2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - AES Shady Point Asset Purchase Agreement 12.20.18, #3 Exhibit 3 - K. Mitchell Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 4 - AES Shady Point Amended Power Sales Agreement 12.10.85, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to K. Mitchell from M. Miller 8.17.18, #6 Exhibit 6 - Termination Notice 8.24.18, #7 Exhibit 7 - AES Check Request - Distribution Form 2.15.19, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email from Rick Jackson 4.18.19, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email from Carrie Scribner 4.29.19, #10 Exhibit 10 - AES Notice of Default Letter 5.1.20)(Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by AES Shady Point LLC . (Hines, Tami) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER STRIKING the Status and Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, November 3, 2020 at 11:30 a.m., as well as the required filing of the Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan, to reset on the January 2021 status and scheduling conference docket to be set at a later date.. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 10/16/2020. (ks) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#15) ENTER ORDER (Text Only) - A review of the filings in this case reveals that Plaintiff AES Shady Point LLC has not filed a Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of the LLC in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.1.1. Accordingly, the Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiff AES Shady Point LLC to file within 7 days of this order its Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of the LLC pursuant to LCvR 7.1.1. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 10/15/2020. (ks) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Tami J Hines on behalf of AES Shady Point LLC (Hines, Tami) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by James M Reed on behalf of AES Shady Point LLC (Reed, James) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOVEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 10/27/2020. (ks) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand by AES Shady Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Power Sales Agreement Between Oklahoma Gas and Electric Company and AES Shady Point Inc., #2 Exhibit Affidavit R. Jackson, #3 Exhibit Asset Purchase Agreement between AES and OG&E (attached to Notice of Removal))(Hines, Tami) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation.(Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting with modifications #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation answer due 9/30/2020.. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/28/2020. (dtb) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation. (Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation . (Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3274098. (Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by A Craig Tomlin on behalf of Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation (Tomlin, A) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Valerie V Hatami on behalf of Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation (Hatami, Valerie) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Heidi M Nichols on behalf of Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation (Nichols, Heidi) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Robin F Fields on behalf of Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation (Fields, Robin) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer H Castillo on behalf of Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation (Castillo, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2100 filed by Oklahoma Gas & Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Docket, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Termination, #4 Exhibit 4- Purchase Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5- Gluski Biography, #6 Exhibit 6- LinkedIn Profile, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less