This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2020 at 07:28:36 (UTC).

Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC et al v. ACSI Holdings, LLC et al CASE REFERRED TO US BANKRUPCY COURT

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against ACSI Holdings, LLC CASE REFERRED TO US BANKRUPCY COURT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03697

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Interpleaders and Plaintiffs

Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC

Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC

Defendants, Cross Claimants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

ACSI Holdings, LLC

Paul G. Hendershott

Jamison & Associates, PLLC

Fuqua Family Limited Partnership

Thomas R. Bray

Houston, TX 77055

Interpleader, Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Jamison & Associates, PLLC

Thomas R. Bray

Houston, TX 77055

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

B Blue Hyatt

Attorney at Lynch Chappell Alsup PC

300 N Marienfeld, Ste 700

Midland, TX 79701

Billy Blue Hyatt

Attorney at Lynch, Chappell & Alsup, PC

300 N Marienfeld Street, Suite 700

Midland, TX 79701

Eric Walter Kristiansen

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLC

811 Main St, Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Kelsey Marie Sproull

Attorney at BakerHostetler

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Derek W Loetzerich

Attorney at The Law Office of Derek Loetzerich

Po Box 542069

Houston, TX 77254

Defendant, Cross Claimant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Manfred Sternberg, Jr

Attorney at Manfred Sternberg and Associates

1700 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 600

Houston, TX 77056

Jared G. LeBlanc

Attorney at Gordon Arata Montgomery Barnett

1980 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77056

Bruce L Jamison

Attorney at Jamison and Associates PLLC

26010 Oak Ridge Dr, Ste 205

The Woodlands, TX 77380

William Michael Taylor, II

Attorney at Jamison & Associates PLLC

26010 Oak Ridge Drive, Suite 205

The Woodlands, TX 77380

John H. McFarland

Attorney at Joyce & McFarland LLP

712 Main Street, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas R Bray

1318 Glourie Drive

Houston, TX 77055

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) STIPULATION re: Stipulation by Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC, filed.(Hyatt, Billy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#37

(#37) ORDER re: granting #15 MOTION to Refer This Matter to the Bankruptcy Court, denying #5 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION to Dismiss Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC's Plea in Intervention to Interplead Funds into the Registry of the Court. This case is referred to the Bankruptcy Court. The action is referred to Judge Marvin P. Isgur, United States Bankruptcy Judge.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

16 #3

Exhibit 2

16 #2

Exhibit 1

16 #1

Declaration

#16

(#37) ORDER re: granting #15 MOTION to Refer This Matter to the Bankruptcy Court, denying #5 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION to Dismiss Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC's Plea in Intervention to Interplead Funds into the Registry of the Court. This case is referred to the Bankruptcy Court. The action is referred to Judge Marvin P. Isgur, United States Bankruptcy Judge.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles Eskridge. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2019. Parties present. The Court addressed the motion to refer this matter to the Bankruptcy Court #15 and took argument in that regard but noted no oppositions had been filed. The Court noted the motion to remand #20 . The Court took the motions under advisement. Appearances: Derek Loetzerich f/ Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC.; Kelsey Sproull f/ Enterprise Crude Oil; Attorney Thomas Bray representing himself; Jason Beesinger f/ Fuqua Family Limited Partnership; William Taymor f/ Jamison & Associates; Jared LeBlanc f/ Paul Hendershott; Manfred Sternberg f/ ACSI Holdings, Inc..(ERO:used), filed.(jengonzalez, 4) Modified on 3/3/2020 (AmyCooper, 4). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#5

(#37) ORDER re: granting #15 MOTION to Refer This Matter to the Bankruptcy Court, denying #5 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION to Dismiss Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC's Plea in Intervention to Interplead Funds into the Registry of the Court. This case is referred to the Bankruptcy Court. The action is referred to Judge Marvin P. Isgur, United States Bankruptcy Judge.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek W. Loetzerich on behalf of Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC, filed. (Loetzerich, Derek) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Paul G. Hendershott, filed. (LeBlanc, Jared) (Entered: 09/29/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#7) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, CROSSCLAIM against ACSI Holdings, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC by Thomas R. Bray, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Bray, Thomas) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION re: Stipulation by Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC, filed.(Hyatt, Billy) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER re: granting #15 MOTION to Refer This Matter to the Bankruptcy Court, denying #5 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION to Dismiss Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC's Plea in Intervention to Interplead Funds into the Registry of the Court. This case is referred to the Bankruptcy Court. The action is referred to Judge Marvin P. Isgur, United States Bankruptcy Judge.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles Eskridge. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2019. Parties present. The Court addressed the motion to refer this matter to the Bankruptcy Court #15 and took argument in that regard but noted no oppositions had been filed. The Court noted the motion to remand #20 . The Court took the motions under advisement. Appearances: Derek Loetzerich f/ Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC.; Kelsey Sproull f/ Enterprise Crude Oil; Attorney Thomas Bray representing himself; Jason Beesinger f/ Fuqua Family Limited Partnership; William Taymor f/ Jamison & Associates; Jared LeBlanc f/ Paul Hendershott; Manfred Sternberg f/ ACSI Holdings, Inc..(ERO:used), filed.(jengonzalez, 4) Modified on 3/3/2020 (AmyCooper, 4). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Notice of Appearance of Counsel - Eric W. Kristiansen and Kelsey R. Sproull by Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC, filed.(Kristiansen, Eric) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Resetting as to TIME ONLY. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge, filed. (jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Michael Taylor on behalf of Jamison & Associates, PLLC, filed. (Taylor, William) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for B.Blue Hyatt to Appear as Attorney by Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyatt, Billy) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE Status Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) JOINDER in #30 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, filed by Fuqua Family Limited Partnership. (McFarland, John) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Thomas R. Bray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bray, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC, filed.(Loetzerich, Derek) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fuqua Family Limited Partnership, filed.(McFarland, John) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CROSSCLAIM against ACSI Holdings, LLC filed by Fuqua Family Limited Partnership.(McFarland, John) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal, CROSSCLAIM against ACSI Holdings, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC by Thomas R. Bray, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Bray, Thomas) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against ACSI Holdings, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC by Jamison & Associates, PLLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jamison, Bruce) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jamison & Associates, PLLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2019. (Jamison, Bruce) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek W. Loetzerich on behalf of Texas Oil Resources Operating, LLC, filed. (Loetzerich, Derek) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Paul G. Hendershott, filed. (LeBlanc, Jared) (Entered: 09/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 190th Judicial District, case number 2019-51894 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23261599) filed by Fuqua Family Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McFarland, John) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enterprise Crude Oil, LLC is a litigant