This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:39:24 (UTC).

Uzzanti v. Kelsar Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Uzzanti filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Kelsar Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Uzzanti

Defendants

Kelsar Incorporated a Domestic Corporation doing business as Synergy Homecare of Paradise Valley

Unknown Parties

Synergy HomeCare Franchising LLC a domestic limited liability company doing business as Synergy Homecare of the East Valley

Endredy Enterprises LLC

Michael Endredy

Unknown Endredy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

C Lincoln Combs

Attorney at O'Steen & Harrison PLC

300 W Clarendon Ave., Ste. 400

Phoenix, AZ 85013-3424

Jarred James McBride

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Jerica Lyn Peters

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Kevin Charles Nicholas

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2761

Lann McIntyre

Attorney at Lewis DAmato Brisbois & Bisgaard - San Diego, CA

550 W C St., Ste. 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Rita Rebecca Kanno

Attorney at Lewis DAmato Brisbois & Bisgaard - San Diego, CA

550 W C St., Ste. 800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) *MEMORANDUM Supplemental Memoranda re Remand by Defendants Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) *Modified to remove terminated party as a filer on 3/11/2022 (SST). (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#23

(#23) MEMORANDUM Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand by Plaintiff Timothy Uzzanti. (Combs, C) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion for Stipulated Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and setting the briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss due 14 days following a denial of the Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Defendant's Reply to Motion to Dismiss due 7 days following the Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/3/22. (MAW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) Motion to Remand. After Defendant filed its Opposition to the Motion, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued its decision in Saldana v. Glenhaven Healthcare LLC, No. 20-56194, 2022 WL 518989 (9th Cir. Feb. 22, 2022) which rejected removal jurisdiction on the three bases asserted by Defendant in its Notice of Removal. IT IS ORDERED that the parties filed simultaneous Supplemental Memoranda not to exceed five pages addressing the Saldana case and whether its holding requires that this case be remanded. The Memoranda shall be filed not later than March 10, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/1/22. (MAW) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Timothy Uzzanti. (Combs, C) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Remand

12 #12

Main Document

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant Kelsar Incorporated's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. #2 ). The section of the form entitled "The filing party hereby declares as follows" is incomplete. IT IS ORDERED directing Defendant to file an amended corporate disclosure statement no later than January 26, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/24/22. (MAW) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT (Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Kelsar Incorporated. (SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20266419. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00114-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#7) ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant Kelsar Incorporated's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. #2 ). The section of the form entitled "The filing party hereby declares as follows" is incomplete. IT IS ORDERED directing Defendant to file an amended corporate disclosure statement no later than January 26, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/24/22. (MAW) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) SUPPLEMENT (Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) *MEMORANDUM Supplemental Memoranda re Remand by Defendants Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) *Modified to remove terminated party as a filer on 3/11/2022 (SST). (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand by Plaintiff Timothy Uzzanti. (Combs, C) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion for Stipulated Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and setting the briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss due 14 days following a denial of the Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Defendant's Reply to Motion to Dismiss due 7 days following the Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/3/22. (MAW) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION Stipulated Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Timothy Uzzanti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Combs, C) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) Motion to Remand. After Defendant filed its Opposition to the Motion, the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals issued its decision in Saldana v. Glenhaven Healthcare LLC, No. 20-56194, 2022 WL 518989 (9th Cir. Feb. 22, 2022) which rejected removal jurisdiction on the three bases asserted by Defendant in its Notice of Removal. IT IS ORDERED that the parties filed simultaneous Supplemental Memoranda not to exceed five pages addressing the Saldana case and whether its holding requires that this case be remanded. The Memoranda shall be filed not later than March 10, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/1/22. (MAW) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Timothy Uzzanti. (Combs, C) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) *MOTION to Dismiss Case by Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) *Modified to remove terminated party as a filer on 2/22/2022 (SST). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) *RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kelsar Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for Judicial Motion to Remand and in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Errata Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #28 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Kanno, Rita) *Modified to reflect correct event and to remove terminated party as a filer; attorney noticed on 2/22/2022 (SST). (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lann McIntyre on behalf of Defendant Kelsar Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED striking Defendant's Notice of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for 12(i) Hearing and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for 12(i) Hearing for failure to comply with LRCiv 7.2(e)(1). (Docs. #15 and 15.1) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant may have a third and final chance to refile its Motion in compliance with LRCiv 7.2(e)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no motion to exceed the page limit will be granted [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/15/22. (MAW) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #8 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants file their responsive pleading not later than February 4, 2022. Depending on the nature of the responsive pleading, i.e. an answer or motion, the Court will consider a possible stipulation to delay setting any Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/27/22. (MAW) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference) by Kelsar Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Re Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Scheduling Conference))(Kanno, Rita) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant Kelsar Incorporated's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. #2 ). The section of the form entitled "The filing party hereby declares as follows" is incomplete. IT IS ORDERED directing Defendant to file an amended corporate disclosure statement no later than January 26, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/24/22. (MAW) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT (Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kelsar Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Kelsar Incorporated. (SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20266419. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00114-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, First Amended Complaint and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Sarah Engelhardt, Statutory Agent for Kelsar Incorporated on 12/22/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 12/23/2021) (SCA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) (SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-01524. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20266419 filed by Kelsar Incorporated. (Kanno, Rita) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Charles Nicholas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rita Rebecca Kanno