This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:53:41 (UTC).

Uzelac v. Depuy Synthes Sales Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Uzelac filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Depuy Synthes Sales Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02885

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theodore Uzelac

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

Depuy Products, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Services Inc.

Depuy Synthes Sales Inc.

DePuy Products Inc

DePuy Synthes Sales Inc

Johnson & Johnson Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Anthony Scully

Attorney at Cooper & Scully PC

900 Jackson St, Suite 100

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin T Pendroff

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

2121 N Pearl St, Suit 700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for one-week docket beginning 2/22/2021 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/27/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's Order Requiring Status and Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Report filed by DePuy Products Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 21 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 21 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/13/2019) (epm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by DePuy Products Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depuy Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc.. (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #7

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #6

Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C District Court Case Files

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B District Court Case Summary

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 14th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-17767 filed by Johnson & Johnson, Depuy Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10460670) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Index, #2 Exhibit(s) B District Court Case Summary, #3 Exhibit(s) C District Court Case Files, #4 Exhibit(s) D Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Exhibit(s) E Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for one-week docket beginning 2/22/2021 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/27/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's Order Requiring Status and Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Report filed by DePuy Products Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 21 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 21 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/13/2019) (epm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by DePuy Products Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depuy Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc.. (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 14th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-17767 filed by Johnson & Johnson, Depuy Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10460670) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A Index, #2 Exhibit(s) B District Court Case Summary, #3 Exhibit(s) C District Court Case Files, #4 Exhibit(s) D Certificate of Interested Persons, #5 Exhibit(s) E Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Pendroff, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less