This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:47:23 (UTC).

UV Logistics LLC v. CISCO Logistics LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 UV Logistics LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CISCO Logistics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are A. Joe Fish and David L. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

A. Joe Fish

David L. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UV Logistics LLC

UV Logistics LLC doing business as United Visions Logistics

Defendants

CISCO Logistics LLC

CISCO Logistics Leasing LLC

North American Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca Whitney Wright

Attorney at Rathbone Group LLC

1100 Superior Ave, Suite 1850

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jessica R Lobes

Attorney at Rathbone Group LLC

1001 Texas Ave, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Richard M Mosher

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

700 North Pearl St, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Extend Time to file Joint Status Report and ORDER OF TRANSFER: Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/3/2019) (zkc) Modified docket text on 7/3/2019 (cea). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#22

(#22) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Extend Time to file Joint Status Report filed by UV Logistics LLC (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#20

(#20) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2019. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/5/2019) (lag/chmb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CISCO Logistics LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Cisco Logistics, LLC for CISCO Logistics LLC. (Mosher, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the defendants must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/14/2019) (mla) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/14/2019) (mla) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by CISCO Logistics LLC, North American Specialty Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mosher, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/28/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#8

(#8) Supplemental Document by UV Logistics LLC as to #1 Complaint Exhibit C. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Supplemental Document by UV Logistics LLC as to #1 Complaint Exhibit B. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

6 #1

Additional Page(s)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to CISCO Logistics LLC, North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Supplemental Document by UV Logistics LLC as to #1 Complaint Exhibit A. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • Docket(#24) ELECTRONIC ORDER: On July 23, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., the Court will conduct a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) pretrial scheduling conference. Plaintiff's local counsel and Defendants' counsel must attend in person, and Plaintiff's lead counsel may participate by phone. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/9/2019.) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Extend Time to file Joint Status Report and ORDER OF TRANSFER: Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/3/2019) (zkc) Modified docket text on 7/3/2019 (cea). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Extend Time to file Joint Status Report filed by UV Logistics LLC (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2019. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/5/2019) (lag/chmb) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CISCO Logistics LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Cisco Logistics, LLC for CISCO Logistics LLC. (Mosher, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the defendants must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/14/2019) (mla) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/14/2019) (mla) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by CISCO Logistics LLC, North American Specialty Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mosher, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL COUNSEL REQUIREMENT filed by UV Logistics LLC (Lobes, Jessica) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, the plaintiff shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/28/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Supplemental Document by UV Logistics LLC as to #1 Complaint Exhibit C. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Supplemental Document by UV Logistics LLC as to #1 Complaint Exhibit B. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to CISCO Logistics LLC, North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Supplemental Document by UV Logistics LLC as to #1 Complaint Exhibit A. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UV Logistics LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9871410) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Wright, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CISCO Logistics LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UV Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant