This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:22:01 (UTC).

USD 400 Smokey Valley v. JUUL Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 USD 400 Smokey Valley filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathryn H. Vratil and Teresa J. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02738

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathryn H. Vratil

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USD 400 Smokey Valley

Defendant

JUUL Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley D. Honnold

Attorney at Goza & Honnold, LLC

9500 Nall Avenue, Suite 400

Overland Park, KS 66207

Kirk J. Goza

Attorney at Goza & Honnold, LLC

9500 Nall Avenue, Suite 400

Overland Park, KS 66207

Thomas P. Cartmell

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Jonathan P. Kieffer

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Eric D. Barton

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Tyler W. Hudson

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16). Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California (MDL 2913). ***Terminating Case. (hw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by USD 400 Smokey Valley upon JUUL Labs, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Smoky Valley Public Schools Unified School District 400 - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Smoky Valley Public Schools Unified School District 400. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4998059.), filed by Smoky Valley Public Schools Unified School District 400.(Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Kansas has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-08354, filed 12/20/2019. (kao) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of California (MDL 2913).(hw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16). Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California (MDL 2913). ***Terminating Case. (hw) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by USD 400 Smokey Valley upon JUUL Labs, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to JUUL Labs, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Smoky Valley Public Schools Unified School District 400 - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Smoky Valley Public Schools Unified School District 400. (Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4998059.), filed by Smoky Valley Public Schools Unified School District 400.(Cartmell, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less