This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 07:28:05 (UTC).

USA v. Van Ackeren

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 USA filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Van Ackeren. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Kato Crews and Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02726

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

S. Kato Crews

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

Timothy Van Ackeren

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amanda Adams Rocque

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendant Timothy Van Ackeren. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/30/2019. (swest) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Timothy Van Ackeren Attorney Amanda Adams Rocque added to party United States(pty:pla), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rocque, Amanda) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Joint MOTION for Judgment (Consent) by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Consent Judgment)(Rocque, Amanda) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Consent Judgment

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties do not consent.. (Rocque, Amanda) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Defendant Timothy Van Ackeren. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/30/2019. (swest) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02726-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties do not consent.. (Rocque, Amanda) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Joint MOTION for Judgment (Consent) by Plaintiff United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Consent Judgment)(Rocque, Amanda) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Timothy Van Ackeren Attorney Amanda Adams Rocque added to party United States(pty:pla), filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rocque, Amanda) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.