This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 08:45:31 (UTC).

USA v. United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J. Trouba

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 USA filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J Trouba. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Michael D. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00406

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J. Trouba,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy B. Blackburn

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

Christopher L. Ferretti

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - OMAHA

1620 Dodge Street, Suite 1400

Omaha, NE 68102-1506

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew D. Burns

Attorney at LEFLER, KUEHL LAW FIRM

300 South 19Th Street, Suite 304

Omaha, NE 68102

Steven J. Lefler

Attorney at LEFLER, KUEHL LAW FIRM

300 South 19Th Street, Suite 304

Omaha, NE 68102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to extend (Filing No. #7 ) is denied as moot. The defendant's objection (Filing No. #8 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#15

(#15) STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TRO The United States of America and Steve Lefler, on behalf of his client, Thomas J. Trouba, hereby stipulate to an extension of the Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) Filing No. 5 retroactive to October 22, 2020, to and including December 7, 2020. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LRM) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER - A hearing shall be held before the undersigned on November 6, 2020 at 1:30 PM. in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to file under Seal by Attorney Matthew D. Burns on behalf of Defendant United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J. Trouba,.(Burns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#8

(#8) OBJECTION to Motion to Extend #7 by Attorney Matthew D. Burns on behalf of Defendant United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J. Trouba,.(Burns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) MOTION to Extend Restraining Order with sealed Exhibit by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) Modified on 10/29/2020 to seal attachment per motion #6 PDF DOCUMENT IS SEALED PURSUANT TO AN ORDER OF THE COURT AND/OR LEGAL AUTHORITY GOVERNING SEALED FILINGS. ACCESS IS LIMITED ONLY TO THE COURT.(ADB). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit 1 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

2 #1

Affidavit Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit 1 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) Modified on 10/8/2020 to seal attachment #1 per USA (DKM). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to extend (Filing No. #7 ) is denied as moot. The defendant's objection (Filing No. #8 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LKO) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TRO The United States of America and Steve Lefler, on behalf of his client, Thomas J. Trouba, hereby stipulate to an extension of the Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) Filing No. 5 retroactive to October 22, 2020, to and including December 7, 2020. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LRM) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER - A hearing shall be held before the undersigned on November 6, 2020 at 1:30 PM. in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to file under Seal by Attorney Matthew D. Burns on behalf of Defendant United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J. Trouba,.(Burns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OBJECTION to Motion to Extend #7 by Attorney Matthew D. Burns on behalf of Defendant United States Currency in US Bank Account Number 50873504347 in the Name of Thomas J. Trouba,.(Burns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Extend Restraining Order with sealed Exhibit by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) Modified on 10/29/2020 to seal attachment per motion #6 PDF DOCUMENT IS SEALED PURSUANT TO AN ORDER OF THE COURT AND/OR LEGAL AUTHORITY GOVERNING SEALED FILINGS. ACCESS IS LIMITED ONLY TO THE COURT.(ADB). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit 1 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA.(Blackburn, Amy) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal. Exhibit 1 to the Application for Temporary Restraining Order 1 shall remain sealed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to file under Seal Exhibit 1 by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy) Modified on 10/8/2020 to seal attachment #1 per USA (DKM). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less