This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 08:42:57 (UTC).

USA v. Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01279

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Tony Weston

Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam E. Hanna

Attorney at Assistant U.S. Attorney - Fairview Heights

9 Executive Drive, Suite 300

Fairview Heights, IL 62208

 

Court Documents

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. District Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1279-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/5/2020. Consent due by 2/5/2020 (dkd) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc., Tony Weston. (ack) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

4 #1

Consent Brochure

#4

(#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-1279-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cds) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A through C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc., Tony Weston, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • (#8) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-1279-SMY. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. District Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 19-1279-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 2/5/2020. Consent due by 2/5/2020 (dkd) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc., Tony Weston. (ack) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-1279-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cds) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Southeastern Illinois Counseling Centers, Inc., Tony Weston, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.