This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:57:35 (UTC).

USA v. Performance Diesel

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 USA filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Performance Diesel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Nuffer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

Performance Diesel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared C. Bennett

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

111 S Main St Ste 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

Mark C. Elmer

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (ENR-CO)

999 18Th St South Terrace Ste 370

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Richard J. Angell

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

Jeffrey C. Corey

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/6/19 (alt) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#13

(#13) CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Performance Diesel, Defendant to pay a civil penalty to the United States in the amount of $1,100,000, together with interest accruing from today's date - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/6/19 (alt) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff USA. (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay requirements of #6 Order to Propose Schedule pending decision on entry of a proposed Consent Decree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/23/19 (alt) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support re #6 Motion to Propose Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Elmer, Mark) Modified on 9/23/2019: added link and corrected entry text (alt) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Corey on behalf of Performance Diesel (Corey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Angell on behalf of Performance Diesel (Angell, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/13/19. (dla) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Consent Decree

#4

(#4) NOTICE of of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Decree) (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Elmer on behalf of USA (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Appendix Appendix A to Complaint

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Performance Diesel No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/6/19 (alt) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Performance Diesel, Defendant to pay a civil penalty to the United States in the amount of $1,100,000, together with interest accruing from today's date - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/6/19 (alt) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff USA. (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay requirements of #6 Order to Propose Schedule pending decision on entry of a proposed Consent Decree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/23/19 (alt) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support re #6 Motion to Propose Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Elmer, Mark) Modified on 9/23/2019: added link and corrected entry text (alt) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Corey on behalf of Performance Diesel (Corey, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Angell on behalf of Performance Diesel (Angell, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/13/2019. (asb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER to Prepare Schedule and Prepare for Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 9/13/19. (dla) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's #Southern Region web page. (asb) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Decree) (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Elmer on behalf of USA (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Performance Diesel No Filing Fee filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (Elmer, Mark) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge David Nuffer. Plaintiff USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey C. Corey