Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2019 at 08:04:31 (UTC).

USA v. Miller et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Miller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Wier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Wier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

LVNV Funding, LLC

First Financial Credit, Inc.

James E. Miller

Eunice R. Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa R. Dixon

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder Law Offices PLLC - London

1222 1/2 N Main Street, Suite 2

London, KY 40741

Ronald Scott Wilder

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder Law Offices PLLC - London

1222 1/2 N Main Street, Suite 2

London, KY 40741

 

Court Documents

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Financial Credit, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC, Eunice R. Miller, James E. Miller; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (TDA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #8

Proposed Summonses

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Judgment Lien

1 #5

Exhibit E - Judgment Lien

1 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Proof of Statement of Account

1 #3

Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Mortgage

1 #1

Exhibit A - Promissory Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4443027), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Proof of Statement of Account, #5 Exhibit E - Judgment Lien, #6 Exhibit F - Judgment Lien, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summonses) (TDA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via certified mail to First Financial Credit, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; LVNV Funding, LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019; James E. Miller served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Financial Credit, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC, Eunice R. Miller, James E. Miller; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (TDA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4443027), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Proof of Statement of Account, #5 Exhibit E - Judgment Lien, #6 Exhibit F - Judgment Lien, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summonses) (TDA) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION A CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa R. Dixon