This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 10:22:09 (UTC).

USA v. Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00721

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001

Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln

Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Rabuck

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Defendant Attorneys

Roger B. Phillips

Attorney at Phillips Law Office

104 Pleasant St

Concord, NH 03301

Colleen N. Savage

Attorney at Sgro and Roger

720 S 7Th St Ste 3Rd Flr

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

16 #3

Writ of Entry - 2775 Old Shackleford Rd.

16 #2

Writ of Entry - 1576 Creek Bend Ln.

16 #1

Writ of Entry - 333 Summit Ridge Dr.

#16

(#16) Assented to MOTION for Writs of Entry filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry - 333 Summit Ridge Dr., #2 Writ of Entry - 1576 Creek Bend Ln., #3 Writ of Entry - 2775 Old Shackleford Rd.)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Temporarily Lift Stay to Grant Motion for Writs of Entry filed by USA.Follow up on Objection on 8/31/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#14

(#14) CLAIM for Verified Claim of George Kuiper by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. Answer Follow Up on 9/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Savage, Colleen) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#13

(#13) Assented to MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Forfeiture Proceeding filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr.(Savage, Colleen) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Extend Time to August 17, 2020 to respond to Show Cause Order regarding writs of entry, DN 8, filed by USA.Follow up on Objection on 8/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#10

NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. THIS IS AN APPEARANCE OF ANTHONY SGRO AND NOT COLLEEN SAVAGE. ATTORNEY SGRO MUST FOLLOW THE INSTRUCTIONS IN THE ORDER GRANTING PHV ADMISSION AND REFILE AN APPEARANCE UNDER HIS NAME. If the filer has questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1623.(de) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anthony P. Sgro

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger B. Phillips on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln(pty:dft).(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #5

Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 1576 Creek Bend Ln.

1 #4

Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste. 1001

1 #3

Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 333 Summit Ridge Dr.

1 #2

Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 333 Summit Ridge Dr., #4 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste. 1001, #5 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 1576 Creek Bend Ln.)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of ASSENT by Colleen Savage, Esq., counsel for the claimant, George Kuiper as to #15 MOTION to Temporarily Lift Stay to Grant Motion for Writs of Entry .(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Assented to MOTION for Writs of Entry filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Entry - 333 Summit Ridge Dr., #2 Writ of Entry - 1576 Creek Bend Ln., #3 Writ of Entry - 2775 Old Shackleford Rd.)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Temporarily Lift Stay to Grant Motion for Writs of Entry filed by USA.Follow up on Objection on 8/31/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: The request for a stay is granted. A joint status report shall be filed every 90 days. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Status Report due by 11/12/2020. (gla) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLAIM for Verified Claim of George Kuiper by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. Answer Follow Up on 9/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Savage, Colleen) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Assented to MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Forfeiture Proceeding filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr.(Savage, Colleen) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to August 17, 2020 to respond to Show Cause Order regarding writs of entry. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. THIS IS AN APPEARANCE OF ANTHONY SGRO AND NOT COLLEEN SAVAGE. ATTORNEY SGRO MUST FOLLOW THE INSTRUCTIONS IN THE ORDER GRANTING PHV ADMISSION AND REFILE AN APPEARANCE UNDER HIS NAME. If the filer has questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1623.(de) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Extend Time to August 17, 2020 to respond to Show Cause Order regarding writs of entry, DN 8, filed by USA.Follow up on Objection on 8/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Attorneys Sgro and Savage, counsel for George Kuiper , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 7/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 8/14/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of ASSENT by Robert Rabuck, Esquire as to #5 MOTION for Colleen N Savage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999313.), #4 MOTION for Anthony P. Sgro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999308.).(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger B. Phillips on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001, Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste 1001(pty:dft), Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 333 Summit Ridge Dr(pty:dft).(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Colleen N Savage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999313.) filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln.Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Colleen N. Savage)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Anthony P. Sgro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1999308.) filed by Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln.Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anthony P. Sgro)(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger B. Phillips on behalf of Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln Attorney Roger B. Phillips added to party Lawrenceville, GA, 1576 Creek Bend Ln(pty:dft).(Phillips, Roger) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The new case designation is: 1:20-cv-721-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-721-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 333 Summit Ridge Dr., #4 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 2775 Old Shackleford Rd, Ste. 1001, #5 Summons - Waiver Writ of Entry 1576 Creek Bend Ln.)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less