This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2020 at 08:04:01 (UTC).

USA v. Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00303

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Claremont, NH, 10 Grove St

Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Rabuck

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Defendant Attorneys

Dorothy E. Graham-FPD

Attorney at Federal Defender's Office

The Ralph Pill Bldg, 22 Bridge St

Concord, NH 03301

Jaye Rancourt

Attorney at Brennan Lenehan Iacopino & Hickey

85 Brook St

Manchester, NH 03104-3605

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to for Filing Verfified Claim by Sixty (60) Days for Defendant, Maria Aponte filed by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(Rancourt, Jaye) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Appearance on behalf of Maria Aponte by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon Attorney Jaye Rancourt added to party Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon(pty:dft).(Rancourt, Jaye) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Verified Claim by 60 Days filed by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(Graham-FPD, Dorothy) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorothy E. Graham-FPD on behalf of Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon Attorney Dorothy E. Graham-FPD added to party Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon(pty:dft).(Graham-FPD, Dorothy) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

1 #2

Writ of Entry

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Writ of Entry)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to for Filing Verfified Claim by Sixty (60) Days for Defendant, Maria Aponte. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to for Filing Verfified Claim by Sixty (60) Days for Defendant, Maria Aponte filed by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(Rancourt, Jaye) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Appearance on behalf of Maria Aponte by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon Attorney Jaye Rancourt added to party Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon(pty:dft).(Rancourt, Jaye) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Verified Claim by 60 Days. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Verified Claim by 60 Days filed by Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(Graham-FPD, Dorothy) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorothy E. Graham-FPD on behalf of Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon Attorney Dorothy E. Graham-FPD added to party Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon(pty:dft).(Graham-FPD, Dorothy) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketWRIT of Entry Issued as to Land and Buildings Located at 10 Grove Street, Claremont, NH, with all Appurtenances and Improvements Thereon.(mc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-303-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Writ of Entry)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less