This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2020 at 10:29:02 (UTC).

USA v. All Funds On Deposit In Iron Beam, Inc., ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against All Funds On Deposit In Iron Beam, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claria Horn Boom, Karen K. Caldwell and Hanly A. Ingram. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hanly A. Ingram

Presiding Judges

Claria Horn Boom

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimant

Jennie Scruggs

Defendants

All Funds On Deposit In Iron Beam, Inc.

All Funds on Deposit in Wedbush Securities Inc.

All Funds on Deposit in Central Bank & Trust ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN CENTRAL BANK & TRUST ACCT IN NAME OF WILLIAM EVANS D/B/A TURNING POINT INVESTMENTS, IN NAME OF WILLIAM OR FRANCES EVANS & IN NAME OF FRANCES EVANS TOTALING $2,273,807.47 AS OF - Wil

ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN JP MORGAN CHASE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Haley Trogdlen McCauley, AUSA

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, EDKY

260 W. Vine Street, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40507-1612

Claimant Attorneys

Barry D. Hunter

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

Medrith Lee Norman

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Agent

1 #3

Affidavit

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #11 Notice (GLD) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Jennie Scruggs of Claim to Property Sought to be Forfeited by Plaintiff, United States of America (Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this matter was reassigned to the undersigned for all further proceedings. (DE #6 ). Accordingly, having reviewed the record, and being sufficiently advised, IT IS ORDERED that the Standing Case Management and Referral Order (DE #5 ) is VACATED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/16/20.(JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/14/2020.(GLD)cc: COR (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Effective immediately this case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Caldwell for all further proceedings pursuant to LR 40 and GO governing case assignment for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/5/20.(MRS) cc: COR (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (VACATED, pursuant to Order DE #10 ). STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (JLM)cc: COR Modified text on 10/16/2020 (JLM). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Upon review of this matter, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the Court must conclude that recusal in this matter is required. For this reason, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign the case by random draw to another Judge accepting cases on the Lexington docket pursuant to the General Order governing case assignment. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/01/20.(JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by USA re #1 Complaint of Related Prosecution (McCauley, Haley) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLM) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Agent, #3 Affidavit)(JLM) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wedbush Securities, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Medrith Lee Norman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry D. Hunter