This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 10:39:41 (UTC).

USA v. $50,040.00 in US Currency

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 50,040 00 in US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan Webber Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01422

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan Webber Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

$50,040.00 in US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda J. Jegley

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Cameron Charles McCree

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. $50,040.00 in US Currency served on 12/7/2020. (McCree, Cameron) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $50,040.00 in US Currency filed by USA. Warrant and Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. $50,040.00 in US Currency served on 12/7/2020. (McCree, Cameron) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $50,040.00 in US Currency filed by USA. Warrant and Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda J. Jegley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Charles McCree