This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2020 at 09:14:08 (UTC).

USA v. $47,900.00 in US Currency et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 47,900 00 in US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00260

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

$37,690.00 in US Currency

$47,900.00 in US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cameron Charles McCree

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Amanda J. Jegley

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Defendant Attorney

Justin Byrum Hurst

Attorney at Hurst Law Group

518 Ouachita Avenue

Hot Springs, AR 71901

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda J. Jegley on behalf of USA (Jegley, Amanda) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

4 #1

Proposed Final Scheduling Order

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/9/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/23/2020. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 4/26/2021 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by All Defendants of Claim of Brittany Brown & Timeless Memories, LLC (Hurst, Justin) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by $37,690.00 in US Currency, $47,900.00 in US Currency.(Hurst, Justin) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against All Defendants filed by USA. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda J. Jegley on behalf of USA (Jegley, Amanda) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/9/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/23/2020. Proposed Bench Trial set sometime during the week of 4/26/2021 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by All Defendants of Claim of Brittany Brown & Timeless Memories, LLC (Hurst, Justin) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by $37,690.00 in US Currency, $47,900.00 in US Currency.(Hurst, Justin) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against All Defendants filed by USA. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda J. Jegley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Charles McCree