This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2020 at 09:05:28 (UTC).

USA v. $332,057.00 in US Currency

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 332,057 00 in US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

$332,057.00 in US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda J. Jegley

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Cameron Charles McCree

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Defendant Attorney

Adam Joseph Childers

Attorney at Childers Law Firm, PLLC

315 North Broadway Street

North Little Rock, AR 72114

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by $332,057.00 in US Currency.(Childers, Adam) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/24/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/8/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/3/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/28/2020. (tmw) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#4

(#4) CLAIM Verified Claim for Seized Property by $332,057.00 in US Currency (Childers, Adam) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Joseph Childers on behalf of $332,057.00 in US Currency (Childers, Adam) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed. $332,057.00 in US Currency served on 3/25/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $332,057.00 in US Currency filed by USA. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by $332,057.00 in US Currency.(Childers, Adam) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/24/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/8/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/3/2021 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 04/28/2020. (tmw) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLAIM Verified Claim for Seized Property by $332,057.00 in US Currency (Childers, Adam) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Joseph Childers on behalf of $332,057.00 in US Currency (Childers, Adam) (Entered: 04/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed. $332,057.00 in US Currency served on 3/25/2020. (fjg) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $332,057.00 in US Currency filed by USA. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda J. Jegley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Charles McCree