This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:00:28 (UTC).

USA v. $2,730.00 Dollars in United States Currency et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 2,730 00 Dollars in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimants

Lisa Guzman

Freddy Antonio Acosta Herrera

Sabina Peralta

Luis Manuel Rosario

Defendants

$3,500.00 Dollars in United States Currency

$2,730.00 Dollars in United States Currency

$4,020.00 Dollars in United States Currency

$5,330.00 Dollars in United States Currency

$4,900.00 Dollars in United States Currency

$3,318.00 Dollars in United States Currency

$2,600.00 Dollars in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Christopher Nelson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

157 Church St., 25Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06510

Claimant Attorney

Lindy R. Urso

Attorney at Lindy R. Urso, Attorney at Law

810 Bedford Street - Suite 3

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CLAIM Verified by Freddy Antonio Acosta Herrera. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#10

(#10) CLAIM Verified by Lisa Guzman. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 01/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#12

(#12) CLAIM Verified by Sabina Peralta. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#5

(#5) WARRANT of Arrest In Rem Issued (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Sabina Peralta (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#6

(#6) WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed as to $2,730.00 Dollars in United States Currency et al. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Freddy Antonio Acosta Herrera (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Lisa Guzman (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/09/2020)

#11

(#11) CLAIM Verified by Luis Manuel Rosario. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Luis Manuel Rosario (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 01/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Standing Protective Order, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 01/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Lisa Guzman (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLAIM Verified by Freddy Antonio Acosta Herrera. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLAIM Verified by Sabina Peralta. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLAIM Verified by Luis Manuel Rosario. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLAIM Verified by Lisa Guzman. (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Freddy Antonio Acosta Herrera (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Sabina Peralta (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindy R. Urso on behalf of Luis Manuel Rosario (Urso, Lindy) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed as to $2,730.00 Dollars in United States Currency et al. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WARRANT of Arrest In Rem Issued (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Standing Protective Order, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 01/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 01/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 01/06/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.