This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:20:17 (UTC).

USA v. $26,210.00 US Currency

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 26,210 00 US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01243

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

$26,210.00 US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Rabuck

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Advertisement Certification Report

2 #1

Legal Notice

#2

(#2) SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 2/1/2020. Claim due on 3/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Legal Notice, #2 Advertisement Certification Report)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #2

Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 2/1/2020. Claim due on 3/2/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Legal Notice, #2 Advertisement Certification Report)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSummons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to $26,210.00 US Currency. (mc) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1243-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less