This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 07:41:17 (UTC).

USA v. $15,515.00 US. Currency

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 15,515 00 US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01078

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimants

Evelyn Gomez

Christopher Hildreth

Defendants

$15,515.00 U.S. Currency

$15,515.00 US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Rabuck

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Claimant Attorney

Charles J. Keefe

Attorney at Wilson Bush & Keefe PC

378 Main St

Nashua, NH 03060

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Legal Notice

9 #1

Advertisement Certification Report

#9

(#9) SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 11/28/2019. Claim due on 12/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Legal Notice)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Keefe on behalf of Evelyn Gomez (Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CLAIM for $15,515.00 in U.S. Currency by Evelyn Gomez. Answer Follow Up on 12/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#6

(#6) CLAIM for $15,515.00 in U.S. Currency by Christopher Hildreth. Answer Follow Up on 12/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Keefe on behalf of Christopher Hildreth, Evelyn Gomez Attorney Charles J. Keefe added to party Christopher Hildreth(pty:clm), Attorney Charles J. Keefe added to party Evelyn Gomez(pty:clm).(Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Charles Keefe, Esq., counsel for Christopher Hildreth , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 10/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Charles Keefe, Esq., counsel for Evelyn Gomez , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 10/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#2

(#2) US Marshal Service of Process re: Summons-Warrant in Rem/Warrant in Rem/Lis Pendens Issued served on 10/24/2019. (js) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #2

Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 11/28/2019. Claim due on 12/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Legal Notice)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Keefe on behalf of Evelyn Gomez (Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLAIM for $15,515.00 in U.S. Currency by Evelyn Gomez. Answer Follow Up on 12/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM for $15,515.00 in U.S. Currency by Christopher Hildreth. Answer Follow Up on 12/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Keefe on behalf of Christopher Hildreth, Evelyn Gomez Attorney Charles J. Keefe added to party Christopher Hildreth(pty:clm), Attorney Charles J. Keefe added to party Evelyn Gomez(pty:clm).(Keefe, Charles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Charles Keefe, Esq., counsel for Christopher Hildreth , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 10/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Forfeiture Complaint served on Charles Keefe, Esq., counsel for Evelyn Gomez , filed by USA. Forfeiture Complaint served on 10/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Claim due on 11/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) US Marshal Service of Process re: Summons-Warrant in Rem/Warrant in Rem/Lis Pendens Issued served on 10/24/2019. (js) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to $15,515.00 US Currency. (ej) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1078-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less