This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 07:41:11 (UTC).

USA v. $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639 et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 USA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 14,863 66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christine M. Arguello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01355

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimants

Sajida Malik

Waseem Malik

World Food Bazaar, Inc.

Defendants

$4,010.00 in United States currency seized from United Fidelity Bank Safe Deposit Box 701

$1,420.00 in United States currency

$14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Beth Hurd

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Claimant Attorney

Kenneth Mark Harmon

Attorney at Springer & Steinberg, P.C.

1600 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202-4920

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Claimants Sajida Malik, Waseem Malik, World Food Bazaar, Inc.. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#10

(#10) CLAIM by Claimant Waseem Malik. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#9

(#9) CLAIM by Claimant Sajida Malik. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#8

(#8) CLAIM by Claimant World Food Bazaar, Inc.. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Mark Harmon on behalf of World Food Bazaar, Inc., Sajida Malik, Waseem MalikAttorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party World Food Bazaar, Inc.(pty:clm), Attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party Sajida Malik(pty:clm), Attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party Waseem Malik(pty:clm) (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/14/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Warrant for Arrest of Property

1 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $1,420.00 in United States currency, $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639, $4,010.00 in United States currency seized from United Fidelity Bank Safe Deposit Box 701 Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurd, Laura) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Claimants Sajida Malik, Waseem Malik, World Food Bazaar, Inc.. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #8 Claim, #9 Claim, #10 Claim filed by attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon. The documents were scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). Also the documents, including doc #7 , have the incorrect case number in the caption. For all future filings, please include the correct case number on your documents, as follows: 19-cv-01355-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLAIM by Claimant Waseem Malik. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLAIM by Claimant Sajida Malik. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLAIM by Claimant World Food Bazaar, Inc.. (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Mark Harmon on behalf of World Food Bazaar, Inc., Sajida Malik, Waseem MalikAttorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party World Food Bazaar, Inc.(pty:clm), Attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party Sajida Malik(pty:clm), Attorney Kenneth Mark Harmon added to party Waseem Malik(pty:clm) (Harmon, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/14/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $1,420.00 in United States currency, $14,863.66 seized from United Fidelity Bank account number 3028005639, $4,010.00 in United States currency seized from United Fidelity Bank Safe Deposit Box 701 Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurd, Laura) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.