This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:48:23 (UTC).

USA v. $119,449.00 in United States Currency et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 119,449 00 in United States Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01995

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimants

Jose Polanco

Venancia Polanco

Defendants

$6,088.00 in United States Currency

$119,449.00 in United States Currency

$14,640.00 in United States Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John B. Hughes

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

157 Church St., 25Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06510

David Christopher Nelson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

157 Church St., 25Th Floor

New Haven, CT 06510

Claimant Attorneys

Daniel C. Thibodeau

Attorney at Minnella, Tramuta, and Edwards, LLC

530 Middlebury Rd. Suite 103B

Middlebury, CT 06762

Ioannis A. Kaloidis

Attorney at The Kaloidis Law Firm, LLC.

580 Watertown Avenue

Waterbury, CT 06708

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Venancia Polanco (Kaloidis, Ioannis) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against $119,449.00 in United States Currency, $14,640.00 in United States Currency, $6,088.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case by USA (Nelson, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2020 File a Verified Claim by Venancia Polanco. (Kaloidis, Ioannis) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Thibodeau on behalf of Jose Polanco (Thibodeau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#6

(#6) WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2020 File Verified Claim by Jose Polanco. (Thibodeau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#9

(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2020 file verified claim by Jose Polanco. (Thibodeau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/26/2020 to file a verified claim. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/27/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2020 File a Verified Claim by Venancia Polanco. (Kaloidis, Ioannis) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Venancia Polanco (Kaloidis, Ioannis) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying as moot #8 Motion for Extension of Time in light of ECF No. 10. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/24/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 2/27/2020 to file a verified claim. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/24/2020. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2020 file verified claim by Jose Polanco. (Thibodeau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 27, 2020 File Verified Claim by Jose Polanco. (Thibodeau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C. Thibodeau on behalf of Jose Polanco (Thibodeau, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case by USA (Nelson, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against $119,449.00 in United States Currency, $14,640.00 in United States Currency, $6,088.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.