This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2021 at 15:07:07 (UTC).

USA v. $1,006,030.00 in US Currency

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 1,006,030 00 in US Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

$1,006,030.00 in US Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda J. Jegley

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

Cameron Charles McCree

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. (Jegley, Amanda)(Docket text modified on 4/22/2021 to remove the party and date of service) (jak) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $1,006,030.00 in US Currency, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Summons Returned Executed as to USA and Notice of Docket Correction. CORRECTION: The docket text for docket entry #2 was modified to return the text to its original submission pursuant to instruction from the filing attorney. The docket text for the notice of docket correction was modified to indicate it was filed in error.(jak) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (jak) (Docket text modified on 4/22/2021 to indicate the docket correction was filed in error) (jak) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. (Jegley, Amanda)(Docket text modified on 4/22/2021 to remove the party and date of service) (jak) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM against $1,006,030.00 in US Currency, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda J. Jegley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Charles McCree