Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2020 at 07:52:36 (UTC).

USA et al vs Hernandez Consulting, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 USA filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Hernandez Consulting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilbert C. Sison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Active Holdings Group, Inc.

USA

Defendants

Hernandez Consulting, Inc

Hernandez Consulting & Construction

Hernandez Consulting LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C. Wagner

Attorney at John C. Wagner Law Offices, PC

600 39Th Avenue

Amana, IA 52203

 

Court Documents

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

(#10) NOTICE: USA for the use and benefit of Active Holdings Group, Inc. was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, USA for the use and benefit of Active Holdings Group, Inc. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 2/26/2020 (trb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Hernandez Consulting, Inc, Hernandez Consulting, LLC, and Western Surety Company and returned to attorney for service. (trb) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

8 #2

Summons

8 #1

Summons

#8

(#8) Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Wagner, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#7

(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET by USA to #1 Complaint Cover Sheet. (Wagner, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Active Holdings Group, Inc., USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-111-GCS. Consent due by 2/18/2020 (trb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C. Wagner by on behalf of Active Holdings Group, Inc. (Wagner, John) Paid Receipt # 34625099143 Modified on 1/29/2020 (ack). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Notice of Claim

1 #1

Subcontract Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4096736.), filed by Active Holdings Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Subcontract Agreement, #2 Notice of Claim, #3 Summons)(Wagner, John) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wagner, John) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE: USA for the use and benefit of Active Holdings Group, Inc. was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, USA for the use and benefit of Active Holdings Group, Inc. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 2/26/2020 (trb) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Hernandez Consulting, Inc, Hernandez Consulting, LLC, and Western Surety Company and returned to attorney for service. (trb) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Wagner, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET by USA to #1 Complaint Cover Sheet. (Wagner, John) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C. Wagner on behalf of Active Holdings Group, Inc.. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by GenCorp, LLC. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. Also see Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Wagner does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case.(trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by GenCorp, LLC. The summons attached to the complaint has all parties listed on one summons. A separate summons for each defendant will need to be requested. The correct event to use is Civil>Service of Process>Summons Requested. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Active Holdings Group, Inc., USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-111-GCS. Consent due by 2/18/2020 (trb) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C. Wagner by on behalf of Active Holdings Group, Inc. (Wagner, John) Paid Receipt # 34625099143 Modified on 1/29/2020 (ack). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4096736.), filed by Active Holdings Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Subcontract Agreement, #2 Notice of Claim, #3 Summons)(Wagner, John) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Active Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C Wagner