This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2020 at 08:23:21 (UTC).

U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc. v. Mojave Desert Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 U S A Dawgs, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Mojave Desert Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00261

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Appellant

U.S.A. Dawgs, Inc.

Defendant

Dawgs Holdings, LLC

Appellees

Mojave Desert Holdings LLC

Gemcap Lendings I LLC

Trustee

U.S. Trustee

300 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Suite 4300

Las Vegas, NV 89101-5803

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Brigid Higgins

Attorney at Black & Lobello

10777 W. Twain Ave., Suite 300, Las Vegas

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Saul S. Rostamian

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth E. Stephens

Attorney at Sullivan, Hill, Lewin, Rez & Engel

228 South Fourth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Ogonna M Brown

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

3993 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89169-5996

Trustee Attorney

U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas

300 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Suite 4300

Las Vegas, NV 89101-5803

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Notice of Referral

1 #2

Transmittal

1 #3

Appeal memorandum

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #3 Appellant's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of this Bankruptcy Appeal is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Dawgs Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2020. (Higgins, Brigid) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/6/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. Verified Petition due by 3/22/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number BK1810453gs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Referral, #2 Transmittal, #3 Appeal memorandum) (ADR) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (ADR) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S.A. DAWGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GemCap Lending I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brigid Higgins