U.S. Well Services, Inc. et al v. Halliburton Company et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: June 21, 2021. (ir) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the new response date for Cimarex to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is June 21, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cimarex Energy Co., Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. amending #1 Complaint,., filed by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, #9 Exhibit Ex. I)(Yates, John) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC (Yates, John) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketReset Answer Deadlines: Halliburton Company answer due 6/21/2021. (bw) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the time for Defendant Halliburton Company to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to June 21, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Halliburton Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger J. Fulghum on behalf of Halliburton Company. Attorney Roger J. Fulghum added to party Halliburton Company(pty:dft) (Fulghum, Roger) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. Cimarex Energy Co. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Yates, John) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. Halliburton Company served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Yates, John) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Cimarex Energy Co.. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Halliburton Company. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corrected RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Yates, John) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Yates, John) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Yates, John) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Yates, John) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14701513), filed by U.S. Well Services, Inc., U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yates, John) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less