This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:27:14 (UTC).

U.S. Specialty Insurance Company v. City of Grosse Pointe Park

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 U S Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against City of Grosse Pointe Park. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Lawson and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12544

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David M. Lawson

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

Defendant

City of Grosse Pointe Park

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arthur F. Brandt

Attorney at Bates & Carey

191 N. Wackersuite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Erica J. Shell

Attorney at Bodman, PLC

6Th Floor At Ford Field1901 St. Antoine

Detroit, MI 48226

Thomas J. Howlett

Attorney at Bodman PLC

6Th Floor At Ford Field1901 St. Antoine Street

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #8 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by City of Grosse Pointe Park. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A(1), #2 Exhibit A(2)) (Howlett, Thomas) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (Brandt, Arthur) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Howlett on behalf of City of Grosse Pointe Park. (Howlett, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. City of Grosse Pointe Park waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. (Shell, Erica) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica J. Shell on behalf of City of Grosse Pointe Park. (Shell, Erica) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for U.S. Specialty Insurance Company to Show Cause Why the Court Should Not Dismiss the Case. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2021. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *City of Grosse Pointe Park* (KBro) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company Civil Cover Sheet (Brandt, Arthur) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company against City of Grosse Pointe Park. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8671715 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Brandt, Arthur) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erica J. Shell