This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:26:17 (UTC).

U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission v. Wang

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 U S Securities And Exchange Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Wang. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12557

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission

Defendants

Songjiang Wang

Sam Wang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Oliwenstein

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Paul G. Gizzi

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Simona Suh

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

200 Vesey Street, Suite 400

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission. Songjiang Wang waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Gizzi, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G. Gizzi on behalf of U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission (Gizzi, Paul) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by David Oliwenstein (Oliwenstein, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Simona Suh on behalf of U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission (Suh, Simona) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Songjiang Wang. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Songjiang Wang (Fee Status: US Government), filed by U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Oliwenstein, David) (Attachment 2 replaced with corrected category sheet on 12/20/2019 ) (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission. Songjiang Wang waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Gizzi, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G. Gizzi on behalf of U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission (Gizzi, Paul) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by David Oliwenstein (Oliwenstein, David) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Simona Suh on behalf of U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission (Suh, Simona) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Songjiang Wang. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Songjiang Wang (Fee Status: US Government), filed by U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Oliwenstein, David) (Attachment 2 replaced with corrected category sheet on 12/20/2019 ) (Currie, Haley). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONA K. SUH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul G. Gizzi