This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:18:48 (UTC).

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. CICCONE et al

Case Summary

On September 29, 2021, the United States Securities and Exchange Commission (“SEC” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Leslie J. Hughes, attorney at SEC’s Denver regional office, filed a civil enforcement action against Gregory A. Ciccone and Platinum Travel and Entertainment L.L.C. (“Platinum”) (collectively, “Defendants”) and Platinum Enterprises & Concierge Services, Inc. (“Platinum Enterprises”) (“Relief Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief, civil money penalties, and disgorgement of all ill-gotten gains along with prejudgment interest for the alleged defraud committed by Defendants. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of New Jersey with Judges Claire C. Cecchi and Andre M. Espinosa presiding.

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant Gregory A. Ciccone, a convicted felon acting through his company, Platinum defrauded investors out of over $1.5 million. From July 2018 through February 2020 (the “Relevant Period”), Ciccone and Platinum offered and sold promissory notes to investors for the purported purpose of securing hotel reservations as part of Platinum’s luxury travel business. Ciccone and Platinum told investors that Platinum was a successful business that reserved blocks of rooms at luxury hotels and resold the reservations at a profit, from which investors would be repaid principal and interest on their notes.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Rather than use investor money in connection with Platinum’s luxury travel business as he had promised, Ciccone misappropriated the vast majority of the money and used much of the remainder to make Ponzi-like payments. Ciccone initially solicited investors directly and later recruited an acquaintance (referred to here as “Sales Agent 1”) to solicit investors in Platinum. Ciccone told Sales Agent 1 his phony story about his successful, luxury travel business with the knowledge and expectation that Sales Agent 1 would disseminate those false and misleading statements to prospective investors. Ciccone never disclosed to investors that he was looting the money raised.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “From August through September 2019, Ciccone directed investors who purchased promissory notes from Platinum to transfer their funds to bank accounts held in the name of Platinum Enterprises & Concierge Services, Inc. (“Platinum Enterprises”), an entity he controlled. Platinum Enterprises provided no consideration for receipt of the investors’ funds and was unjustly enriched.”

There are five claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim deals with the alleged fraud—Section 10(b) of the Exchange and Rule 10b-5 thereunder. The second claim deals with alleged fraud – violations of Section 10(b) of the Exchange Act and Rule 10b-5(b) thereunder as Prohibited by Section 20(b) of the Exchange Act. The third claim deals with alleged fraud – Section 17(a) of the Securities Act. The fourth claim deals with the alleged offer and sale of unregistered Securities – Section 5(a) and (c) of the Securities Act. The fifth claim deals with the alleged disgorgement from Relief Defendant – Section 6501 of the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2021, Pub. L. No. 116-283 and Equitable Principles.

In its prayer for relief Plaintiff has requested the court for an injunction permanently restraining and enjoining Ciccone from participating in the issuance, purchase, offer, or sale of any security. Plaintiff also requested the court to order Defendants and Relief Defendants to disgorge all ill-gotten gains, together with pre-judgment interest, and order Defendants to pay civil money penalties pursuant to Section 20(d) of the Securities Act and Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-17768

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Defendants

PLATINUM TRAVEL AND ENTERTAINMENT, L.L.C.

PLATINUM ENTERPRISES & CONCIERGE SERVICES, INC.

GREGORY A. CICCONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESLIE J. HUGHES

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit 1 Docket

12 #1

Declaration of Leslie J. Hughes

12 #12

Main Document

11 #3

Exhibit 2 Certificate regarding military service

11 #2

Exhibit 1 Docket

11 #1

Declaration of Leslie J. Hughes

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Exhibit 1 Docket Sheet 10-29-2021

10 #1

Declaration of Leslie J. Hughes

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re #8 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons - Request for Issue,, Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. PLATINUM ENTERPRISES & CONCIERGE SERVICES, INC. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. PLATINUM TRAVEL AND ENTERTAINMENT, L.L.C. served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (HUGHES, LESLIE) Modified on 10/25/2021 (jc, ). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GREGORY A. CICCONE served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

13 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Platinum Travel by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie J. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1 Docket)(HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Gregory Ciccone by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie J. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1 Docket, #3 Exhibit 2 Certificate regarding military service)(HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketClerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PLATINUM ENTERPRISES & CONCIERGE SERVICES, INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Entry of Default against Platinum Enterprises & Concierge Services Inc. by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie J. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1 Docket Sheet 10-29-2021)(HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re #8 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons - Request for Issue,, Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. PLATINUM ENTERPRISES & CONCIERGE SERVICES, INC. served on 10/7/2021, answer due 10/28/2021. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. PLATINUM TRAVEL AND ENTERTAINMENT, L.L.C. served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (HUGHES, LESLIE) Modified on 10/25/2021 (jc, ). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GREGORY A. CICCONE served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to GREGORY A. CICCONE, PLATINUM TRAVEL AND ENTERTAINMENT, L.L.C., Relief Defendant PLATINUM ENTERPRISES & CONCIERGE SERVICES, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (jr) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Summons to be Issued by U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION as to Platinum Enterprises & Concierge Services, Inc.. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION as to Platinum Travel and Entertainment, L.L.C.. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION as to GREGORY CICCONE. (HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GREGORY CICCONE, Platinum Enterprises & Concierge Services, Inc., Platinum Travel and Entertainment, L.L.C. with JURY DEMAND, filed by U.S. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation of Agent for Service)(HUGHES, LESLIE) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less