This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 07:20:36 (UTC).

U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Carebourn Capital, LP et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 U S Securities and Exchange Commission filed an Other lawsuit against Carebourn Capital, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07162

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

Respondents

Booski Consulting, LLC

Carebourn Capital, LP

Carebourn Partners, LLC

More Capital LLC

More Capital Partners, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Timothy Jon Stockwell

Attorney at U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission

Suite 900, 175 W. Jackson Blvd

Chicago, IL 60604

Daniel J. Hayes

Attorney at United States Securities and Exchange Commission

175 West Jackson Street, Suite 1300

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #2

Exhibit 2

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #11

Exhibit 11

6 #10

Exhibit 10

6 #6

Exhibit 6

6 #3

Exhibit 3

#6

#3

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/7/2021.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for default #11 is granted. Enter order. Civil case remains closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion for default judgment #11 set for 1/7/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Petitioner shall serve a copy of its motion #11 and this order on Respondent's counsel via email. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Petitioner U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission for default judgment as to Respondents Carebourn Capital, LP, Carebourn Partners, LLC, More Capital, LLC, More Capital Partners, LP, and Booski Consulting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to set a briefing schedule #8 is granted in part. Petitioner may effect service on Respondents by delivering copies to Respondents by UPS overnight delivery, with copies sent to Respondent's counsel via email and UPS overnight delivery. Respondents shall respond to Petitioner's application by 12/21/2020; Petitioner shall reply by 12/30/2020. The court does not anticipate that discovery or evidence will be necessary to resolve this matter, but reserves the question at this juncture. The status hearing set for 1/13/2021 #9 is stricken and re-set for 1/7/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #3 and #7 are granted. Status hearing set for 1/13/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Petitioner U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission to set a briefing schedule and establish other summary procedures (Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Petitioner U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Government Attorney for Charles J. Kerstetter (Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Charles J. Kerstetter regarding memorandum #4 , complaint #1 In Support of Application to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission by Daniel J. Hayes (Hayes, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM complaint #1 by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission In Support of Application to Compel Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas (Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Petitioner U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Government Attorney (Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - Application for an Order Compelling Compliance with Administrative Subpoenas filed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission; (Stockwell, Timothy) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carebourn Partners, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Hayes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy J. Stockwell