This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:44:09 (UTC).

US Melon LLC v. Avila Produce Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 US Melon LLC filed an Other - Agriculture Subsidy lawsuit against Avila Produce Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00880

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Agriculture Subsidy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Melon LLC

Defendants

Ronald William Carlett

Avila Produce Inc.

Greta Teresa Santos

Jesus Arturo Avila

Ronald William Catlett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Stokes

Attorney at Stokes Law Office LLP

3330 Oakwell Court - Suite 225

San Antonio, TX 78218

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12387169), filed by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Open Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Avila Produce, #4 Summons to Jesus Avila, #5 Summons to Ronald Carlett, #6 Summons to Greta Santos)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #4

Summons to Jesus Avila

1 #5

Summons to Ronald Carlett

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons to Avila Produce

1 #1

Exhibit A - Open Invoices

1 #6

Summons to Greta Santos

#2

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b) by US Melon LLC re #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

2 #2

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion for Order to Show Cause

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by US Melon LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 12 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions Motion to Dissolve TRO, MOTION to Vacate August 7, 2019 Hearing by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 12 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions Motion to Dissolve TRO, MOTION to Vacate August 7, 2019 Hearing by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) ORDER re #17 MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Ronald William Catlett served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Jesus Arturo Avila served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by US Melon LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER re #17 MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Withdraw #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 12 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions Motion to Dissolve TRO, MOTION to Vacate August 7, 2019 Hearing by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Ronald William Catlett served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Jesus Arturo Avila served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Melon LLC. Avila Produce Inc. served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Service of Temporary Restraining Order upon Defendants by US Melon LLC re 12 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Personal Service, #2 Exhibit B - Service via Facsimile)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Greta Teresa Santos. (aej) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Ronald William Carlett. (aej) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Jesus Arturo Avila. (aej) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Avila Produce Inc.. (aej) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by US Melon LLC. to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons to J. Avila, #2 Summons to R. Carlett, #3 Summons to G. Santos)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (aej) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by US Melon LLC. (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b) by US Melon LLC re #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Memorandum in Support, filed by US Melon LLC, re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff US Melon LLC, #2 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff US Melon LLC (Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ***VACATED PER COURT ORDER #18*** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Craig) Modified on 8/5/2019 (aej). (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff's Representative, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Motion for Order to Show Cause)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12387169), filed by US Melon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Open Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Avila Produce, #4 Summons to Jesus Avila, #5 Summons to Ronald Carlett, #6 Summons to Greta Santos)(Stokes, Craig) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.