This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 08:42:07 (UTC).

US Foods, Inc. v. Sarabeth Creations, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 US Foods, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sarabeth Creations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05586

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US Foods, Inc.

Defendants

Sarabeth Creations, Inc.

Sara Juliano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian L. Shaw

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

123 N Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

Christina M Sanfelippo

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

123 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Defendants did not appear. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default against Sarabeth Creations, Inc. #10 is granted. Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses without prejudice Defendant Sara Juliano. See #16 . Plaintiff's motion for entry of default against Defendant Sara Juliano #12 is withdrawn as moot. Initial status hearing set for 12/17/2021 is stricken. Motion for default judgment will be heard on 1/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by US Foods, Inc. re status report #17 (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#17

(#17) STATUS Report (Initial Status Report) by US Foods, Inc. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by US Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Sara Juliano) (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit A

#12

(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit A

#10

(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Christina M Sanfelippo for presentment of motion for entry of default #10 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/14/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Foods, Inc. as to Sarabeth Creations, Inc. on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 12/13/2021. Initial telephone conference is set for 12/17/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Brian L. Shaw (Amended) (Shaw, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#20) DOCUMENT REMOVED as it was entered on the incorrect case number. Modified on 12/17/2021 (cdh, ). (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held telephonically. Defendants did not appear. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default against Sarabeth Creations, Inc. #10 is granted. Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses without prejudice Defendant Sara Juliano. See #16 . Plaintiff's motion for entry of default against Defendant Sara Juliano #12 is withdrawn as moot. Initial status hearing set for 12/17/2021 is stricken. Motion for default judgment will be heard on 1/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by US Foods, Inc. re status report #17 (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATUS Report (Initial Status Report) by US Foods, Inc. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by US Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Sara Juliano) (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by US Foods, Inc. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiffs' motions for entry of default order [10, 12] will be heard telephonically on 12/14/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free, call-in number 877-336-1829, passcode is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Motion by Christina M Sanfelippo for presentment of motion for entry of default #12 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/14/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. for entry of default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Christina M Sanfelippo for presentment of motion for entry of default #10 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/14/2021 at 09:15 AM. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Foods, Inc. as to Sarabeth Creations, Inc. on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 12/13/2021. Initial telephone conference is set for 12/17/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Sara Juliano and Sarabeth Creations, Inc. (lxk, ) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Christina M Sanfelippo (Amended) (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Brian L. Shaw (Amended) (Shaw, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Brian L. Shaw (Shaw, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. by Christina M Sanfelippo (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by US Foods, Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18789699. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sanfelippo, Christina) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina M Sanfelippo

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian L Shaw