This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 08:48:53 (UTC).

U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Southland Contracting, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 U S Equal Employment Opportunity Commission filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Southland Contracting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judge overseeing this case is WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendants

Southland Contracting, Inc.

Mole Constructors, Inc.

Does 1 - 5

Southland Mole JV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Yau

Attorney at Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

300 Ala Moana Blvd Rm 7-127

Honolulu, HI 96813

Anna Y. Park

Attorney at US Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Los Angeles

Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street 4Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant Attorney

Christopher J. Cole

Attorney at Marr Jones & Wang

1003 Bishop Street Ste 1500, 536-4900, Fax: 536-6700

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT DECREE; ORDER; EXHIBIT A - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/10/2019. (jo) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#13

(#13) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and Defendants Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV, Mole Constructors, Inc. Please continue to reflect case number CV 19-00530 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Cole on behalf of Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV on behalf of Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV. (Cole, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Southland Mole JV. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Southland Contracting, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Mole Constructors, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

6 #1

Election Form

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo) Modified on 10/1/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (Entered: 09/30/2019)

5 #2

Waiver of the Service of Summons

5 #1

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 11/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

2 #2

Proposed Summons

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Park, Anna) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT DECREE; ORDER; EXHIBIT A - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 10/10/2019. (jo) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and Defendants Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV, Mole Constructors, Inc. Please continue to reflect case number CV 19-00530 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent Election Form. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Cole on behalf of Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV on behalf of Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV. (Cole, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Consent Election Form (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Southland Mole JV. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Southland Contracting, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Mole Constructors, Inc. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (jo) Modified on 10/1/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 11/25/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00530 WRP on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Park, Anna) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1 - 5, Mole Constructors, Inc., Southland Contracting, Inc., Southland Mole JV, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Park, Anna) Modified on 10/1/2019 : Additional Defendants Mole Constructors, Inc. and Southland Mole JV are not identified in the party caption of the Complaint (emt, ). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.