This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/29/2022 at 21:13:24 (UTC).

U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Armed Forces Services Corporation

Case Summary

On July 5, 2022, the United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (“EEOC” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Anna Y. Park, Connie K. Liem and Nakkisa Akhavan of the U.S. EEOC, filed a civil rights action against Armed Forces Services Corporation (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged employment discrimination by the defendant. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California, with Judge Cynthia Bashant presiding.

In the complaint, Plaintiff stated, “This is an action brought by Plaintiff United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, as amended, and Title I of the Civil Rights Act of 1991 (hereinafter ‘Title VII’) to correct unlawful employment practices and to provide appropriate relief to the Charging Party.”

Plaintiff alleged, “Armed Forces Services Corporation unlawfully discriminated against Charging Party on the basis of sex (female) and retaliation. The employment practices alleged to be unlawful were committed within the jurisdiction of the United States District Court for the Southern District of California.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant has continuously been a corporation doing business within California and the jurisdiction of the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Defendant has continuously employed fifteen (15) or more persons. All conditions precedent have been fulfilled by more than thirty (30) days prior to the institution of this lawsuit.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Prior to filing suit, the Commission issued Defendant a Letter of Determination on the charge of discrimination, finding reasonable cause to believe that Title VII was violated and invited Defendant to join with the Commission in informal methods of conciliation to endeavor to eliminate the discriminatory practices and provide appropriate relief. The Commission engaged in communications with Defendant and provided Defendant the opportunity to remedy the discriminatory practices as described in the Letter of Determination.”

 The plaintiff additionally alleged, “On or about June 2017, Charging Party began her employment with Defendant. From June 2017 through early July 2018, Defendant allowed Charging Party to be subjected to sexual harassment based on sex (female). After complaining about the sexual harassment, Charging Party was subjected to retaliation.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “The effect of the practices complained of, has been to deprive Charging Party of equal employment opportunities and otherwise adversely affect her status as an employee because of sex, female. The unlawful employment practices complained of, caused Charging Party to suffer emotional distress.”

Plaintiff stated one claim for relief for alleged violation of Section 703 (a)(1) of Title VII, 42 U.S.C. § 42 U.S.C. 2000e-2(a)(1).

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested injunctive and declaratory relief along with an award of punitive damages and costs of litigation.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Bashant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Defendant

Armed Forces Services Corporation doing business as Magellan Federal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna Y Park

Connie K Liem

Nakkisa Akhavan

Defendant Attorney

Shareef Farag

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (exs) (jms). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Government Attorney by Connie K Liem on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Liem, Connie)Attorney Connie K Liem added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla) (jmo). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant Armed Forces Services Corporation dba Magellan Federal by Shareef Farag on behalf of Armed Forces Services Corporation (Farag, Shareef)Attorney Shareef Farag added to party Armed Forces Services Corporation (pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Joint Motion to Approve Consent Decree and Order by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Liem, Connie) (jmo). (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Consent Decree and Order Granting #5 Joint Motion to Approve Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/12/2022. (ave) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent Decree and Order Granting #5 Joint Motion to Approve Consent Decree. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/12/2022. (ave) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Joint Motion to Approve Consent Decree and Order by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Liem, Connie) (jmo). (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant Armed Forces Services Corporation dba Magellan Federal by Shareef Farag on behalf of Armed Forces Services Corporation (Farag, Shareef)Attorney Shareef Farag added to party Armed Forces Services Corporation (pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Government Attorney by Connie K Liem on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Liem, Connie)Attorney Connie K Liem added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla) (jmo). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (exs) (jms). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Armed Forces Services Corporation (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-999-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Park, Anna)(exs)(jms). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less