This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:15:17 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA v. MOORE et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 US BANK TRUST NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MOORE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendants

ELAINE G MOORE

BRYAN G MOORE

Vassalboro, ME 04989

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #9

Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #8

Exhibit H - Demand Letters

1 #7

Exhibit G - Quitclaim Assignment

1 #6

Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank

1 #5

Exhibit E - Assignment into Nationstar

1 #4

Exhibit D - Assignment into BAC

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B - Note

1 #1

Exhibit A - Legal Description

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketReset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Elaine G. Moore : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/16/2019. (jwr) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Elaine G. Moore By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Elaine G. Moore by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 7/2/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to ELAINE MOORE on 6/17/2019. (jwr) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. ELAINE G MOORE served on 4/19/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BRYAN G MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for BRYAN G MOORE: Answer due by 5/9/2019. (jgd) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. BRYAN G MOORE served on 4/18/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT With Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004004.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from US BANK TRUST NA by 4/17/2019. (slg) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ELAINE G MOORE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BRYAN G MOORE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BRYAN G MOORE, ELAINE G MOORE, filed by US BANK TRUST NA. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 7/9/2019) Fee due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into BAC, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment into Nationstar, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #7 Exhibit G - Quitclaim Assignment, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(slg) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN A. DOONAN